Tile Shop Holdings, Inc. v. Allied World National Assurance Company
Plaintiff: Tile Shop Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: Allied World National Assurance Company
Case Number: 0:2017cv00776
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Tony N. Leung
Presiding Judge: Ann D. Montgomery
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 71 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 120 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Ann D. Montgomery on 6/4/2019. (TLU)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 248 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Numbers: 73, 78, 82, 103, 107, 146, 154, 156, 161, 165, 167, 171, 172, 173, 175, 176, 177, 180, 181, 183, 184, 185, 186, 187, 188, 189, 190, 194, 208, 213, 228, 229, and 236.Document Numbers to be UNSEALED: 76, 77, 79, 80, 81, 83, 84, 85, 86, 87, 88, 89, 90, 91, 92, 93, 94, 95, 96, 97, 98, 99, 100, 101, 102, 104, 105, 106, 108, 109, 110, 111, 112, 113, 114, 11 5, 116, 117, 126, 127, 128, 129, 130, 131, 132, 133, 134, 135, 136, 137, 138, 139, 140, 141, 142, 143, 144, 147, 149, 150, 152, 153, 155, 157, 158, 159, 160, 162, 163, 164, 166, 168, 169, 170, 174, 179, 192, 193, 195, 196, 197, 198, 199, 200, 201, 20 2, 203, 204, 211, 212, 214, 215, 221, 222, 223, 224, 225, 226, 227, 230, 231, 232, 233, 234, and 235. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 6/13/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 5/16/2019. (JRE)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 61. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 12/5/2018 unless further timely submissions are filed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/7/2018. (Erickson, Justin)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tile Shop Holdings, Inc. v. Allied World National Assurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile Shop Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T Boos
Represented By: Emily Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World National Assurance Company
Represented By: Anthony J Alt
Represented By: Bradley M Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?