Benner v. Saint Paul Public Schools, I.S.D. #625
Plaintiff: Aaron A. Benner
Defendant: Saint Paul Public Schools, I.S.D. #625
Case Number: 0:2017cv01568
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Katherine M. Menendez
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 112 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings; granting 112 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/20/2019. (BJP)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 73 Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is set for trial on the Courts August 19, 2019 trial calendar. A separate pretrial order will be issued forthwith. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/3/2019. (SMD)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER entered on 96 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. See Order for details. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 2/15/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 1/18/2019. (BJP)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part 56 Motion to Compel(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/5/2018. (BJP)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/04/2017. (SMD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benner v. Saint Paul Public Schools, I.S.D. #625
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron A. Benner
Represented By: Reid M Goldetsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Paul Public Schools, I.S.D. #625
Represented By: Sarah E Bushnell
Represented By: Jeffrey M Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?