Wing Enterprises, Inc. v. Tricam Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2017cv01769
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 440 OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant Tricam Industries, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment 159 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 1/7/2021.(RMM)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 428 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to stay 375 is DENIED, Defendant's motion for attorneys' fees and nontaxable costs 372 is DENIED, and Defendant's motion to review the cost judgment in this matter 420 is GRANTED. See Order for additional details and specifics. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/6/2019. (RMM)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 OPINION AND ORDER granting 159 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 220 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Donald S. Bloswick; granting 224 Defendant's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Hal Poret. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/9/2019. (RMM)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER denying 144 Motion (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 2/11/2019. (TMA)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Strike Pleading 109 MOTION to Strike Pleading Plaintiff's Untimely Supplemental Interrogatory Responses (Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 12/4/2018. (TMA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wing Enterprises, Inc. v. Tricam Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?