Nagel v. United Food and Commerical Workers Union, Local 653
Plaintiff: Matthew Nagel
Defendant: United Food and Commerical Workers Union, Local 653
Case Number: 0:2018cv01053
Filed: April 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Dakota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M. Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Defendant United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local 653's motion for summary judgment 189 is GRANTED. 2. Defendant United Food and Commercial Workers Union, Local 653's motion to exclude expert testimony 203 is DENIED AS MOOT. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 1/18/2022. (RJE)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 221 and 227 Joint Motions Regarding Continued Sealing. Docket Nos. 194, 194-6, 195-15, 195-16, 195-19, 195-29, 195-34, 195-38, 195-58, 195-64, 195-65, 195-74, 217-2, 217-4, 217-11, 217-24, 217-2 5, 217-29, 217-30, 217-33, 217-36, and 217-38 will be UNSEALED in accordance with the Local Rules. Docket Nos. 191, 194-1, 192-2, 194-3, 194-4, 194-5, 194-7, 194-8, 195, 195-1, 195-2, 195-3, 195-4, 195-5, 195-6, 195-7, 195-8, 195-9, 195-10, 1 95-11, 195-12, 195-13, 195-14, 195-17, 195-18, 195-20, 195-21, 195-22, 195-23, 195-24, 195-25, 195-26, 195-27, 195-28, 195-30, 195-31, 195-32, 195-33, 195-35, 195-36, 195-37, 195-39, 195-40, 195-41, 195-42, 195-43, 195-44, 195-45, 195-46, 195-47, 195 -48, 195-49, 195-50, 195-51, 195-52, 195-53, 195-54, 195-55, 195-56, 195-57, 195-59, 195-60, 195-61, 195-62, 195-63, 195-66, 195-67, 195-68, 195-69, 195-70, 195-71, 195-72, 195-73, 195-75, 195-76, 195-77, 195-78, 195-79, 197, 197-1, 197-2, 197-3, 197 -4, 197-5, 197-6, 197-7, 197-8, 197-9, 199, 199-1, 199-2, 199-3, 199-4, 199-5, 201, 201-1, 201-2, 205, 216, 217, 217-1, 217-3, 217-5, 217-6, 217-7, 217-8, 217-9, 217-10, 217-12, 217-13, 217-14, 217-15, 217-16, 217-17, 217-18, 217-19, 217-20, 217-21, 217-22, 217-23, 217-26, 217-27, 217-28, 217-31, 217-32, 217-34, 217-35, 217-37, 217-39, 217-40, 217-41, 217-42, 219, 220, 220-1, 220-2, 220-3, 220-4, 220-5, and 220-6 will remain SEALED Order on continued sealing becomes final on 8/16/2021 unless further timely submissions are filed.See Order for further instructions.Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/19/2021. (SK)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/2/2021. (RJE)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 132 152 and 153 Joint Motions Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 124, 125, 125-1, 125-3, 125-6, 125-7, 125-8, 125-9, 125-10, 125-11, 125-12, 125-14, 125-15, 125-16, 125-17, 125-18, 125-19, 125-20, 125-21, 125-22, 125-23, 125-24, 125-25, 125-28, 125-30, 125-31, 125-32, 125-34, 125-35, 125-36, 125-37, 125-39, 125-40, 135, 137, 137-2 through 137-31, 137-33 through 137-48, 137-50, 137-51, 137-52, 137-53, 140, 140-1, 141, 141-1 thro ugh 141-9, 144, 144-1 through 144-5, 146, 146-1, 146-2, and 148.Document Number(s) to be UNSEALED: 125-2, 125-4, 125-5, 125-13, 125-26, 125-27, 125-29, 125-33, 125-38, 137-1, 137-32, 137-49, 150, 150-1, 150-2, 150-3, 150-4, 150-5, and 150-6. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 11/17/2020 unless further timely submissions are filed.See Order for further instructions.(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/20/2020. (SGK)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Local 653's motion to dismiss 14 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as to Count 1 and GRANTED as to Count 2. (Please see order for details) (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 3/4/2019. (RJE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagel v. United Food and Commerical Workers Union, Local 653
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Nagel
Represented By: Scott Moriarity
Represented By: Shawn J Wanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commerical Workers Union, Local 653
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?