IN RE PORK ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Plaintiff: Anbessa Tufa, Lisa Axelrod, Christina Hall, Sandra Steffen, Lisa Melegari, Wanda Duryea, Jennifer Sullivan, Matthew Hosking, Edwin Blakey, Michael Reilly, Paul Glantz, John McKee, Donya Collins, Jordan Chambers, Charles Dye, Craig Thomsen, Michael Anderson, Rebekah Kingsley, Borhan Ishani Afoosi, Rebecca Green Watson, Barbara Brueggemann, David Look, Jeffrey Allison, Alika Naehu, Duncan Birch, Robert Eccles, Chase Hoke, Kenneth King, Susan McCullough, Ryan Kutil, Michiya Petrucci, Kenneth Neal, Joseph Realdine, Michael Pickett, Kory Bird, Chad Nodland, Thomas Cosgrove, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Francis T. Enterprises, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., Longhorn's Steakhouse, Confetti's, Sandee's Bakery, John Gross and Company, Inc., Michael O'Grady, Joe Lopez, Reid Kanda, Dan Watson, Phil's BBQ, Inc., Amelia Litterer, Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Ferraro Foods, Inc., Gondolier Pizza International, Inc., Ziggy's BBQ Smokehouse & Ice Cream Parlor, LLC, MCMJOYNT LLC, Grady Corporation, The, Betty's Eat Shop, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Lauren Crawley, Maplevale Farms, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc., Francis T. Enterprises individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as Erbert & Gerbert's, MCMJOYNT LLC individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as The Breakfast Joynt, Joe Lopez individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as Joe's Steak and Leaf, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc., Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Edley's Restaurant Group, LLC, Basil Mt. Pleasant, LLC, Basil Charlotte, Inc., Farrah's Courtyard Deli, Inc., Tri-Ten LLC, Eric Schaub, Kate Smith, Sarah Isola, Chris Deery, Laura Wheeler, James Eaton, Isabelle Bell, Stacy Troupe, Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu, Inc., Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods and Wakefern Food Corp.
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, JBS USA, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Indiana Packers Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Seaboard Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Hormel Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Mitsubishi Corporation (Americas), The Clemens Family Corporation, Erbert & Gerbert's, Inc., Hatfield Quality Meats, Inc. and Sherwood Food Distributors, L.L.C.
Case Number: 0:2018cv01776
Filed: June 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John F Docherty
2 Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
3 Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1500 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1493 MOTION to Compel (Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Sales Data) filed by Amory Investments LLC, Compass Group USA, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard B. Samuels, Sysco Corporation.(Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1499 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1493 Motion to Compel, filed by Amory Investments LLC, Compass Group USA, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard B. Samuels, Sysco Corporation.(Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1498 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1497 Sealed Document(s) - #1497 Sealed Exhibit B, [1497-1] Sealed Exhibit C, [1497-2] Sealed Exhibit D, [1497-3] Sealed Exhibit E, [1497-4] Sealed Exhibit F filed by Amory Investments LLC, Compass Group USA, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard B. Samuels, Sysco Corporation.(Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1497 SEALED EXHIBIT B re #1495 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit C, #2 Sealed Exhibit D, #3 Sealed Exhibit E, #4 Sealed Exhibit F)(Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1496 EXHIBIT List re #1495 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Amory Investments LLC, Compass Group USA, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard B. Samuels, Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1495 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1493 MOTION to Compel (Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Sales Data) filed by Amory Investments LLC, Compass Group USA, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard B. Samuels, Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1494 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1493 MOTION to Compel (Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Sales Data) : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2022 at 04:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. (Eddy, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1493 MOTION to Compel (Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Sales Data) filed by Amory Investments LLC, Compass Group USA, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard B. Samuels, Sysco Corporation. (Eddy, David)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1492 FIILED IN ERROR: MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elaine T. Byszewski. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9768484 filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel) Modified text on 9/20/2022 (KMO).
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1491 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #949 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #990 Motion for Final Approval of Settlement. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/14/2022. (HMA)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1490 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Hormel Defendants (Washburn, Bryan)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1489 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda R Jesteadt on behalf of Buffalo Wild Wings Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cheney Brothers, Inc., Jimmy John's Buying Group SPV, LLC, Restaurant Services, Inc., Sonic Industries Services, Inc., Subway Protein Litigation Crop., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Litigation Trust, Wawa, Inc.. (Jesteadt, Amanda)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1488 ORDER on (1486 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-JFD) Stipulation. Motions (non-disp) due 11/14/2022 or 14 days after the close of fact discovery, whichever is latest. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty on 9/9/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-JFD et al.(MME)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1487 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1486 Stipulation,. (Taylor, Jarod)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1486 STIPULATION Amending Pretrial Scheduling Order by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. Jointly Signed by All Defendants, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Taylor, Jarod)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1485 NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Ernest Shiftan (Shiftan, Benjamin)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1484 FILED IN ERROR: MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abigail Pershing. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9729797 filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel) Modified text on 8/30/2022 (KMO).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1483 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Newton Reinig on behalf of Triumph Foods, LLC. (Reinig, Jacob)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1482 NOTICE of Change of Address by Melissa S. Weiner (Weiner, Melissa)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1481 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1480 Sealed Document(s) - filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Thomson, William)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1480 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 through 9 re #1478 Declaration in Opposition filed by Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9)(Thomson, William)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1479 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1466 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Coleman, Craig)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1478 DECLARATION of Peter J. Schwingler in Opposition to #1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibits 1 through 9, #2 Exhibit(s) 10, #3 Exhibit(s) 11)(Thomson, William)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1477 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1474 , #1470 Sealed Document(s) - 1470 Memorandum, 1474 Sealed Exhibit, 1474-1 thru 1474-15 filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Coleman, Craig)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1476 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1466 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Coleman, Craig)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1475 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Seaboard Foods, LLC re #1473 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Seaboard Foods, LLC.(Thomson, William)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1474 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit Index re #1472 Declaration in Support, filed by Agri Stats, Inc.; Clemens Food Group, LLC; Hormel Foods Corporation; Seaboard Corporation; Seaboard Foods, LLC; The Clemens Family Corporation; Triumph Foods, LLC; Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Errata A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) D, #4 Exhibit(s) E, #5 Exhibit(s) G, #6 Exhibit(s) H, #7 Exhibit(s) I, #8 Exhibit(s) J, #9 Exhibit(s) K, #10 Exhibit(s) L, #11 Exhibit(s) M, #12 Exhibit(s) N, #13 Exhibit(s) O, #14 Exhibit(s) P, #15 Exhibit(s) Q)(Coleman, Craig)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1473 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation.(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1472 Declaration of Craig Coleman in Support of #1466 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C, #2 Exhibit(s) F)(Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1471 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1453 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1470 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1466 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer filed by Agri Stats, Inc.; Clemens Food Group, LLC; Hormel Foods Corporation; Seaboard Corporation; Seaboard Foods, LLC; The Clemens Family Corporation; Triumph Foods, LLC; Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1469 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1453 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1468 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1466 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer : Date and time to be determined. (Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1467 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1462 , #1465 , #1460 , #1459 Sealed Document(s) - filed by Seaboard Foods, LLC.(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1466 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1465 SEALED EXHIBIT 1, 8, 10 re #1462 Declaration in Support, filed by Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 8, #3 Exhibit(s) 10)(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1464 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1463 Sealed Document(s) - 1463 Declaration, 1463-1 thru 1463-23 filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1463 SEALED DECLARATION of Craig Coleman in Opposition to #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Agri Stats, Inc.; Clemens Food Group, LLC; Hormel Foods Corporation; Seaboard Corporation; Seaboard Foods, LLC; The Clemens Family Corporation; Triumph Foods, LLC; Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S, #20 Exhibit(s) T, #21 Exhibit(s) U, #22 Exhibit(s) V, #23 Exhibit(s) W)(Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1462 Declaration of William D. Thomson in Support of #1453 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams filed by Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Placeholder for Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Placeholder for Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Placeholder for Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11)(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1461 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate re #1459 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support by William Thomson on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Thomson, William) Modified text/links on 8/26/2022 (ACH).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1460 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foots, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Coleman, Craig)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1459 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1453 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams filed by Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation.(Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1458 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1449 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum : Date and time to be determined. (Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1457 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1449 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony,. (Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1456 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony (Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1455 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1452 , #1450 Sealed Document(s) - #1450 Sealed Memorandum in Support and #1452 Sealed Exhibit A filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1454 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1449 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1453 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Michael Williams filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Thomson, William)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1452 SEALED EXHIBIT Ex. A re #1450 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Triumph Foods.(Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1451 DECLARATION of Christopher A. Smith re #1450 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1450 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1449 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum filed by Triumph Foods. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1449 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Russell Mangum filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Smith, Christopher)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1448 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1446 , #1445 Sealed Document(s) - #1445 Sealed RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Certify Class (DPP); #1446 Sealed DECLARATION of Allison M. Vissichelli filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1447 DECLARATION of Allison Marie Vissichelli re #1446 Declaration in Opposition,,, #1445 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1446 SEALED DECLARATION of Allison Marie Vissichelli in Opposition to #1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 18)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/25/2022 (ACH).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1445 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1318 MOTION to Certify Class Defendants' Response in Opposition to Motion to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/25/2022 (ACH).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1444 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #1441 , #1442 Sealed Document(s) - #1441 Sealed RESPONSE in Opposition to Motions to Certify Class; #1442 Sealed DECLARATION of Lindsey Strang Aberg filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1443 DECLARATION of Lindsey Strang Aberg re #1441 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1442 Declaration in Opposition,,,,,,,, by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20, #21 Exhibit(s) 21, #22 Exhibit(s) 22, #23 Exhibit(s) 23, #24 Exhibit(s) 24, #25 Exhibit(s) 25, #26 Exhibit(s) 26, #27 Exhibit(s) 27, #28 Exhibit(s) 28, #29 Exhibit(s) 29, #30 Exhibit(s) 30, #31 Exhibit(s) 31, #32 Exhibit(s) 32, #33 Exhibit(s) 33, #34 Exhibit(s) 34, #35 Exhibit(s) 35, #36 Exhibit(s) 36, #37 Exhibit(s) 37, #38 Exhibit(s) 38, #39 Exhibit(s) 39, #40 Exhibit(s) 40, #41 Exhibit(s) 41, #42 Exhibit(s) 42, #43 Exhibit(s) 43, #44 Exhibit(s) 44, #45 Exhibit(s) 45, #46 Exhibit(s) 46, #47 Exhibit(s) 47, #48 Exhibit(s) 48)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1442 SEALED DECLARATION of Lindsey Strang Aberg in Opposition to #1318 MOTION to Certify Class , #1340 MOTION to Certify Class , #1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit(s) Sealed Exhibit 48)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/25/2022 (ACH).
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1441 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition re #1318 MOTION to Certify Class , #1340 MOTION to Certify Class , #1334 MOTION to Certify Class (Defendants' SEALED Omnibus Opposition) filed by Tyson Foods, Inc.; Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.; Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany) Modified text on 8/25/2022 (ACH).
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1440 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #1427 Letter to District Judge - Unopposed Request to Change Class Certification Opposition Briefing Structure. The proposed briefing structure is APPROVED. Ordered by Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/23/2022.(HMA)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1439 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1438 Declaration of Marcus Bozeman in Support of #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1437 Declaration of Jon Tostrud in Support of #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1436 Declaration of David Cialkowski in Support of #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1435 Declaration of Don Barrett in Support of #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1434 Declaration of Jonathan Cuneo in Support of #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1433 Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter in Support of #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1432 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1431 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards : Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge John R. Tunheim. (Raiter, Shawn)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1430 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1429 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits 5-6 (Corrected Exhibit 5) re #1339 Declaration in Support,, filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 9-14, #2 Exhibit(s) 19-20, #3 Exhibit(s) 22-23, #4 Exhibit(s) 25-28, #5 Exhibit(s) 30-69, #6 Exhibit(s) 71-84)(Finley, Alec)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1428 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1334 MOTION to Certify Class (Corrected Memorandum) filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C)(Finley, Alec)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1427 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Unopposed Request to Change Class Certification Opposition Briefing Structure. (Aberg, Lindsey)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1426 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Jason) Modified text on 8/15/2022 (CLK).
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1425 NOTICE of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Notice of Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (Scarlett, Shana)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1424 ORDER granting #1361 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/22/2022. (HMA)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2022 re #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion granted. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HMA)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1422 Redacted Document for #1421 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Eddy, David)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1421 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Compass Group USA, Inc.. No summons requested. (Eddy, David)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1420 (Text-Only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge John R. Tunheim. **Location change only. Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(HMA)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1419 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1368 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Nelson, Jessica)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1418 NOTICE of Appearance by Cadio Zirpoli on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Zirpoli, Cadio)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1417 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Luke Manfredi on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Manfredi, Travis)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1416 (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-1776 JRT/JFD. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and conferences before the magistrate judge in this case will be cancelled unless otherwise indicated by the new MJ courtroom deputy. (CLK)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1415 NOTICE of Appearance by Tanner Cook on behalf of Triumph Foods, LLC. (Cook, Tanner)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1414 NOTICE by Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Supervalu, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Unified Grocers, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp. of Change of Firm Affiliation (Cramer, Phillip)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1413 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL BY ATTORNEY THEODORE B. BELL (Bell, Theodore)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1412 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Notice of Withdrawal of Felix Gilman) (Taylor, Jarod)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1411 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Buller on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Buller, Morgan)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1410 STATUS REPORT Status Update Regarding Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims Process by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Pearson, Michael)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1409 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Tabbaa, JeanAnn)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1408 NOTICE OF Withdrawal as Attorney Thomas J. Nolan filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Pearson, Clifford) Modified text on 6/28/2022 (CLK).
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1407 Redacted Document for #1347 SEALED Declaration of HAL J. SINGER, PH.D. in Support of MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1406 Redacted Document for #1345 Declaration of SHANA E. SCARLETT in Support of MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1405 Redacted Document for #1343 SEALED MOTION To Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1404 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Western District of North Carolina, 3:22-51; District of Minnesota, 22-1610 JRT/HB. (kt)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1403 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Wall on behalf of Triumph Foods, LLC. (Wall, Amanda)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1402 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate Ledden on behalf of Triumph Foods, LLC. (Ledden, Kate)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1401 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1395 MOTION of Direct Action Plaintiffs to Set Deadline for Defendants to File Answers filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc..(Taylor, Jarod)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1400 ORDER granting #1399 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 1278, 1280, 1282, 1283, 1284, 1288, 1290, 1291, 1294, 1296, 1298, 1300, 1302, 1304, 1306, 1308, 1310, 1312, 1314, 1316. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 7/19/2022 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/21/2022. (LNP)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1399 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #1278 Sealed Document #1280 , #1282 , #1283 , #1284 , #1288 , #1290 , #1291 , #1294 , #1296 , #1298 , #1300 , #1302 , #1304 , #1306 , #1308 , #1310 , #1312 , #1314 , #1316 filed by JBS USA Food Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S, #20 Exhibit(s) T)(Nelson, Jessica)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1398 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Zimmerman on behalf of Triumph Foods, LLC. (Zimmerman, Sarah)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1397 ORDER on #1393 Stipulation to Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order [ECF No. 658]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/16/2022.(MJA)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1396 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1395 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Amory Investments LLC, Sysco Corporation.(Jones, Sarah)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1395 MOTION of Direct Action Plaintiffs to Set Deadline for Defendants to File Answers filed by Amory Investments LLC, Sysco Corporation. (Jones, Sarah)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1394 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1393 Stipulation,. (Aberg, Lindsey)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1393 STIPULATION Amending Pretrial Scheduling Order by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. Jointly Signed by All Defendants, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Aberg, Lindsey)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1392 ORDER granting #1370 Motion to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/13/2022. (HMA)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1391 NOTICE of Appearance by John Barton Goplerud on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Goplerud, John)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1390 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Notice of Withdrawal of Madeline Greathouse) (Taylor, Jarod)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1389 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. re Class Certification and Fact Discovery Deadlines Extension. (Taylor, Jarod)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1388 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Ling Wang) (Hedlund, Daniel)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1387 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of Change of Firm Affiliation for Attorney Cadio Zirpoli (Clark, Brian)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1386 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Travis Manfredi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9555966 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Clark, Brian) Modified text on 6/7/2022 (KMO).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1385 ORDER approving #1376 Stipulation Regarding Withdrawal of Northwestern Selecta, Inc.s Exclusion from the Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/6/2022.(HMA)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1384 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1234 Status Conference to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (Thomson, William)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1383 NOTICE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Notice of Recent Decision in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motions for Class Certification) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Bruckner, W)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1382 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1380 Sealed Document(s) - #1380 Errata to Declaration of Hal J. Singer, Ph.D. in Support of Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification . (Scarlett, Shana)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1381 FILED IN ERROR. INSTRUCTED TO REFILE//Redacted Document for #1380 Errata to the Declaration of Hal J. Singer, Ph.D. in Support of Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification . (Scarlett, Shana) Modified text on 5/27/2022 (MTB).
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1380 SEALED Errata to the Declaration of Hal J. Singer, Ph.D. in Support of Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1379 ORDER in Response to #1378 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/26/2022.(MJA)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1378 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Smithfield Foods, Inc. Joint Letter from all MDL DAPs and defendants seeking guidance on redactions in the DAPs amended complaints. (Robison, Brian)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1377 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1376 Stipulation,. (Bruckner, W)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1376 STIPULATION Regarding Withdrawal of Northwestern Selecta, Inc.'s Exclusion from the Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company, JBS USA Food Company Holdings, Swift Pork, and Northwestern Selecta, Inc.. (Bruckner, W)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1375 STATUS REPORT (Status Update Regarding Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Claims Process) by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Bruckner, W)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1374 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1370 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1373 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari in Support of #1370 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachments 1-4)(Raiter, Shawn)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1372 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1370 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1371 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1370 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. : Date and time to be determined. (Raiter, Shawn)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1370 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1369 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1234 Status Conference to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (Smith, Christopher)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1368 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/9/2022 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (48 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 5/25/2022. Redaction Request due 6/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2022. (LAS)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1367 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1366 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1361 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1365 Declaration of Bobby Pouya in Support of #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1364 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner in Support of #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13, #14 Exhibit(s) 14, #15 Exhibit(s) 15, #16 Exhibit(s) 16, #17 Exhibit(s) 17, #18 Exhibit(s) 18, #19 Exhibit(s) 19, #20 Exhibit(s) 20)(Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1363 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1362 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1361 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Interim Payment of Attorneys' Fees, Current and Ongoing Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bruckner, W)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1360 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Indiana Packers Corporation, filed jointly. (Owen, Stephen)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1359 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Fleming on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Fleming, Lauren)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1358 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1356 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Thomson, William)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1357 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #1356 Order on Motion to Compel,,, Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Stilson, Jaime)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1355 (Text-Only) ORDER: This matter is before the Court on two letters on behalf of the Defendants in this MDL. [See ECF Nos. #1353 , #1354 .] Defendants ask the Court to suspend their obligation to answer or respond to the amended complaints of the Direct Action Plaintiffs (DAPs) in light of the pending case management issues related to a possible consolidated master complaint and answer. [See ECF Nos. #1231 , #1232 , #1233 , #1234 , #1236 , #1237 .] Except for Sysco and Armory Investments, counsel for DAPs agreed not to insist on a response to their amended complaints so long as Defendants provided a list of affirmative defenses no later than May 27, 2022. [See ECF No. #1354 at 1.] Sysco and Armory Investments object to deferring the response date on the ground that they have been and continued to be prejudiced by the delay. [See ECF No. [1354-1].] While the Court is sympathetic with Sysco and Armory Investment's concerns, the Court agrees that outstanding case management issues warrant the suspension of Defendants' duty to answer or otherwise fully respond to amended DAP complaints until those issues are resolved. In the forthcoming case management order, the Court will set a schedule for answering or otherwise responding to the DAP complaint(s). In the meantime, Defendants must provide each DAP with a list of affirmative defenses no later than May 27, 2022. It is so ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/10/2022.(MJA)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1354 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Smithfield Foods, Inc. letter with an update on the parties discussions about the date to respond to the DAPs amended complaints. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Email attachment)(Robison, Brian)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1356 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2022 re 1) 18cv1776 ECF No. #1219 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Indiana Packers Corporation to Produce Documents Responsive to Subpoena Duces Tecum and 2) 22mc26 ECF No. #1 Indiana Packers Corporation's Motion to Quash Subpoena. The Court granted in part and denied in part Indiana Packers Corporation's motion to quash. The Court denied as moot Plaintiffs' motion to compel. See entry for details and deadlines. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (MJA)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1353 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Smithfield Foods, Inc. notifying Court of Defendants' understanding of response date. (Robison, Brian)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1352 FILED IN ERROR- MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John C. Kakinuki. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9493053 filed by Sandee's Bakery. (Raiter, Shawn) Modified text on 5/10/2022 (KMO).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1351 REPLY re #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bourne, Joseph)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1350 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1349 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1340 Motion to Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1348 Declaration of ERIC SCHACHTER in Support of #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1347 SEALED Declaration of HAL J. SINGER, PH.D. in Support of #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CONSUMER INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS'.(Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1346 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1345 SEALED Declaration of SHANA E. SCARLETT in Support of #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CONSUMER INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS'. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibits 1-10, #2 Sealed Exhibits 11-20, #3 Sealed Exhibits 21-30, #4 Sealed Exhibits 31-40, #5 Sealed Exhibits 41-50, #6 Sealed Exhibits 51-60, #7 Sealed Exhibits 61-70, #8 Sealed Exhibits 71-80, #9 Sealed Exhibits 81-90, #10 Sealed Exhibits 91-100, #11 Sealed Exhibits 101-110, #12 Sealed Exhibits 111-120, #13 Sealed Exhibits 121-130, #14 Sealed Exhibits 131-140, #15 Sealed Exhibits 141-151)(Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1344 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1342 Sealed Document(s) - Exhibits 5-6 #1342 ; Exhibits 9-14 [1342-1]; Exhibits 19-20 [1342-2]; Exhibits 22-23 [1342-3]; Exhibits 25-28 [1342-4]; Exhibits 30-69 [1342-5]; Exhibits 71-84 [1342-6] filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1343 SEALED MEMORANDUM re #1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by CONSUMER INDIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS'. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1342 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED AT #1429 :SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits 5-6 re #1339 Declaration in Support,, filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 9-14, #2 Exhibit(s) 19-20, #3 Exhibit(s) 22-23, #4 Exhibit(s) 25-28, #5 Exhibit(s) 30-69, #6 Exhibit(s) 71-84)(Finley, Alec) Modified text on 8/19/2022 (kt).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1341 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1340 MOTION to Certify Class : Date and time to be determined. (Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1340 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1339 Declaration of Blaine Finley in Support of #1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5-6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9-14, #10 Exhibit(s) 15, #11 Exhibit(s) 16, #12 Exhibit(s) 17, #13 Exhibit(s) 18, #14 Exhibit(s) 19-20, #15 Exhibit(s) 21, #16 Exhibit(s) 22-23, #17 Exhibit(s) 24, #18 Exhibit(s) 25-28, #19 Exhibit(s) 29, #20 Exhibit(s) 30-69, #21 Exhibit(s) 70, #22 Exhibit(s) 71-84)(Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1338 Redacted Document for #1337 Memorandum in Support of Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Appointment of Lead Counsel and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C)(Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1337 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: REFILED AT #1428 : SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C)(Finley, Alec) Modified text on 8/19/2022 (kt).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1336 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1334 Motion to Certify Class filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1335 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1334 MOTION to Certify Class : Date and time to be determined. (Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1334 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Finley, Alec)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1333 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1332 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1318 Motion to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1331 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1330 Sealed Document(s) - Sealed Declaration #1330 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1330 SEALED Declaration of Russell W. Mangum III, Ph.D. (Expert Report) in Support of #1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1329 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner in Support of #1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit(s) 1)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1328 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1326 , #1324 , #1325 , #1327 Sealed Document(s) - Exhibit 7 #1324 ; Exhibit 8 [1324-1]; Exhibit 9 [1324-2]; Exhibit 10 [1324-3]; Exhibit 12 [1324-4]; Exhibit 13 [1324-5]; Exhibit 14 [1324-6]; Exhibit 16 [1324-7]; Exhibit 17 [1324-8] Exhibit 19 [1324-9]; Exhibit 20 [1324-10]; Exhibit 21 [1324-11]; Exhibit 22 [1324-12]; Exhibit 23 [1324-13]; Exhibit 24 [1324-14]; Exhibit 25 [1324-15]; Exhibit 26 [1324-16]; Exhibit 27 [1324-17]; Exhibit 28 [1324-18]; Exhibit 29 [1324-19]; Exhibit 30 [1324-20]; Exhibit 31 [1324-21]; Exhibit 33 [1324-22]; Exhibit 34 [1324-23]; Exhibit 35 [1324-24]; Exhibit 37 [1324-25]; Exhibit 39 [1324-26]; Exhibit 41 #1325 ; Exhibit 42 [1325-1]; Exhibit 43 [1325-2]; Exhibit 44 [1325-3]; Exhibit 45 [1325-4]; Exhibit 46 [1325-5]; Exhibit 47 [1325-6]; Exhibit 48 [1325-7]; Exhibit 49 [1325-8]; Exhibit 50 [1325-9]; Exhibit 51 [1325-10]; Exhibit 52 [1325-11]; Exhibit 53 [1325-12]; Exhibit 54 [1325-13]; Exhibit 55 [1325-14]; Exhibit 56 [1325-15]; Exhibit 57 [1325-16]; Exhibit 58 [1325-17]; Exhibit 59 #1326 ;; Exhibit 60 [1326-1]; Exhibit 61 [1326-2]; Exhibit 62 [1326-3]; Exhibit 63 [1326-4]; Exhibit 64 [1326-5]; Exhibit 65 [1326-6]; Exhibit 66 [1326-7]; Exhibit 67 [1326-8]; Exhibit 68 [1326-9]; Exhibit 69 [1326-10]; Exhibit 70 [1326-11]; Exhibit 71 [1326-12]; Exhibit 72 [1326-13]; Exhibit 73 [1326-14]; Exhibit 74 [1326-15]; Exhibit 75 [1326-16]; Exhibit 76 [1326-17]; Exhibit 77 [1326-18]; Exhibit 78 [1326-19]; Exhibit 79 [1326-20]; Exhibit 80 [1326-21]; Exhibit 81 [1326-22]; Exhibit 82 [1326-23]; Exhibit 83 [1326-24]; Exhibit 84 [1326-25]; Exhibit 85 [1326-26]; Exhibit 86 [1326-27]; Exhibit 87 [1326-28]; Exhibit 88 [1326-29]; Exhibit 89 [1326-30]; Exhibit 90 [1326-31]; Exhibit 91 [1326-32]; Exhibit 92 [1326-33]; Exhibit 93 [1326-34]; Exhibit 94 [1326-35]; Exhibit 95 [1326-36]; Exhibit 96 [1326-37]; Exhibit 97 [1326-38]; Exhibit 98 [1326-39]; Exhibit 99 [1326-40]; Exhibit 100 #1327 ; Exhibit 101 [1327-1]; Exhibit 102 [1327-2]; Exhibit 103 [1327-3]; Exhibit 104 [1327-4]; Exhibit 107 [1327-5]; Exhibit 108 [1327-6]; Exhibit 109 [1327-7]; Exhibit 110 [1327-8]; Exhibit 112 [1327-9]; Exhibit 113 [1327-10]; Exhibit 114 [1327-11]; Exhibit 115 [1327-12]; Exhibit 116 [1327-13]; Exhibit 117 [1327-14]; Exhibit 118 [1327-15]; Exhibit 119 [1327-16]; Exhibit 120 [1327-17]; Exhibit 121 [1327-18]; Exhibit 122 [1327-19]; Exhibit 123 [1327-20]; Exhibit 124 [1327-21]; Exhibit 125 [1327-22]; Exhibit 126 [1327-23]; Exhibit 127 [1327-24] filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1327 SEALED EXHIBIT 100 re #1322 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 101, #2 Exhibit(s) 102, #3 Exhibit(s) 103, #4 Exhibit(s) 104, #5 Exhibit(s) 107, #6 Exhibit(s) 108, #7 Exhibit(s) 109, #8 Exhibit(s) 110, #9 Exhibit(s) 112, #10 Exhibit(s) 113, #11 Exhibit(s) 114, #12 Exhibit(s) 115, #13 Exhibit(s) 116, #14 Exhibit(s) 117, #15 Exhibit(s) 118, #16 Exhibit(s) 119, #17 Exhibit(s) 120, #18 Exhibit(s) 121, #19 Exhibit(s) 122, #20 Exhibit(s) 123, #21 Exhibit(s) 124, #22 Exhibit(s) 125, #23 Exhibit(s) 126, #24 Exhibit(s) 127)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1326 SEALED EXHIBIT 59 re #1322 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 60, #2 Exhibit(s) 61, #3 Exhibit(s) 62, #4 Exhibit(s) 63, #5 Exhibit(s) 64, #6 Exhibit(s) 65, #7 Exhibit(s) 66, #8 Exhibit(s) 67, #9 Exhibit(s) 68, #10 Exhibit(s) 69, #11 Exhibit(s) 70, #12 Exhibit(s) 71, #13 Exhibit(s) 72, #14 Exhibit(s) 73, #15 Exhibit(s) 74, #16 Exhibit(s) 75, #17 Exhibit(s) 76, #18 Exhibit(s) 77, #19 Exhibit(s) 78, #20 Exhibit(s) 79, #21 Exhibit(s) 80, #22 Exhibit(s) 81, #23 Exhibit(s) 82, #24 Exhibit(s) 83, #25 Exhibit(s) 84, #26 Exhibit(s) 85, #27 Exhibit(s) 86, #28 Exhibit(s) 87, #29 Exhibit(s) 88, #30 Exhibit(s) 89, #31 Exhibit(s) 90, #32 Exhibit(s) 91, #33 Exhibit(s) 92, #34 Exhibit(s) 93, #35 Exhibit(s) 94, #36 Exhibit(s) 95, #37 Exhibit(s) 96, #38 Exhibit(s) 97, #39 Exhibit(s) 98, #40 Exhibit(s) 99)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1325 SEALED EXHIBIT 41 re #1322 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 42, #2 Exhibit(s) 43, #3 Exhibit(s) 44, #4 Exhibit(s) 45, #5 Exhibit(s) 46, #6 Exhibit(s) 47, #7 Exhibit(s) 48, #8 Exhibit(s) 49, #9 Exhibit(s) 50, #10 Exhibit(s) 51, #11 Exhibit(s) 52, #12 Exhibit(s) 53, #13 Exhibit(s) 54, #14 Exhibit(s) 55, #15 Exhibit(s) 56, #16 Exhibit(s) 57, #17 Exhibit(s) 58)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1324 SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #1322 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 8, #2 Exhibit(s) 9, #3 Exhibit(s) 10, #4 Exhibit(s) 12, #5 Exhibit(s) 13, #6 Exhibit(s) 14, #7 Exhibit(s) 16, #8 Exhibit(s) 17, #9 Exhibit(s) 19, #10 Exhibit(s) 20, #11 Exhibit(s) 21, #12 Exhibit(s) 22, #13 Exhibit(s) 23, #14 Exhibit(s) 24, #15 Exhibit(s) 25, #16 Exhibit(s) 26, #17 Exhibit(s) 27, #18 Exhibit(s) 28, #19 Exhibit(s) 29, #20 Exhibit(s) 30, #21 Exhibit(s) 31, #22 Exhibit(s) 33, #23 Exhibit(s) 34, #24 Exhibit(s) 35, #25 Exhibit(s) 37, #26 Exhibit(s) 39)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1323 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 22-mc-26 PJS/DTS has been reassigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/28/2022.(MTB)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1322 Declaration of Bobby Pouya in Support of #1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7-10, #9 Exhibit(s) 11, #10 Exhibit(s) 12-14, #11 Exhibit(s) 15, #12 Exhibit(s) 16-17, #13 Exhibit(s) 18, #14 Exhibit(s) 19-31, #15 Exhibit(s) 32, #16 Exhibit(s) 33-35, #17 Exhibit(s) 36, #18 Exhibit(s) 37, #19 Exhibit(s) 38, #20 Exhibit(s) 39, #21 Exhibit(s) 40, #22 Exhibit(s) 41-104, #23 Exhibit(s) 105, #24 Exhibit(s) 106, #25 Exhibit(s) 107-110, #26 Exhibit(s) 111, #27 Exhibit(s) 112-127)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1321 Redacted Document for #1320 Memorandum of Law in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1320 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1319 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1318 MOTION to Certify Class : Date and time to be determined. (Bruckner, W)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1318 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bruckner, W)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1317 Redacted Document for #1316 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Eddy, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1316 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against All Defendants. filed by Nestle Purina Petcare Company and Nestle USA, Inc.. No summons requested. (Eddy, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1315 Redacted Document for #1314 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Eddy, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1314 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Howard B. Samuels, solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of the estate of Central Grocers, Inc., Strack and Van Til Super Market, Inc., and SVT, LLC. No summons requested. (Eddy, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1313 Redacted Document for #1312 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Eddy, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1312 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Conagra Brands, Inc.. No summons requested. (Eddy, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1311 Redacted Document for #1310 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1310 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc., Seaboard Corporation. filed by Wawa, Inc.. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1309 Redacted Document for #1308 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1308 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc.. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1307 Redacted Document for #1306 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1306 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Jimmy John's Buying Group SPV, LLC. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1305 Redacted Document for #1304 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1304 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Sonic Industries Services, Inc.. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1303 Redacted Document for #1302 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1302 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc.. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1301 Redacted Document for #1300 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1300 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Cheney Brothers, Inc.. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1299 Redacted Document for #1298 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1298 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Subway Protein Litigation Corp., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Litigation Trust. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1297 Redacted Document for #1296 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1296 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Restaurant Services, Inc.. No summons requested. (Esau, David)
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1295 Redacted Document for #1294 Sealed Amended Complaint. (Coffman, Richard) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (ACH).
April 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1294 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Action Meat Distributors, Inc., et al., Giant Eagle, Inc., and UniPro Foodservice, Inc., Plaintiffs. No summons requested. (Coffman, Richard)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1293 Redacted Document for #1291 Sealed Amended Complaint. (Morello, Danielle)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1292 Redacted Document for #1290 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Jones, Sarah)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1291 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by ALDI, INC.. No summons requested. (Morello, Danielle)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1290 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Amory Investments LLC. No summons requested. (Jones, Sarah)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1289 Redacted Document for #1288 Sealed Amended Complaint . (Jones, Sarah)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1288 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Sysco Corporation. No summons requested. (Jones, Sarah)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1287 Redacted Document for #1283 Sealed Amended Complaint (Iovieno, Philip) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (ACH).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1286 Redacted Document for #1282 Sealed Amended Complaint (Iovieno, Philip) Modified text/links on 5/2/2022 (ACH).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1285 Redacted Document for #1284 Sealed Amended Complaint. (Iovieno, Philip) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (ACH).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1284 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Jetro Holdings, LLC. No summons requested. (Iovieno, Philip)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1283 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Sherwood Food Distributors, L.L.C., Harvest Meat Company, Inc., Western Boxed Meat Distributors, Inc., and Hamilton Meat, LLC. No summons requested. (Iovieno, Philip)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1282 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by BJs Wholesale Club, Inc.. No summons requested. (Iovieno, Philip)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1281 Redacted Document for #1280 Sealed Amended COmplaint (Germaine, David) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (ACH).
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1280 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by plaintiffs. No summons requested. (Germaine, David)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1279 Redacted Document for #1278 Sealed Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial . (Blechman, William)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1278 SEALED Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by The Kroger Co., Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee, Inc., Save Mart Supermarkets and US Foods, Inc.. (Blechman, William)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1277 DECLARATION of Jaime Stilson in Opposition to #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Indiana Packers Corporation.(Stilson, Jaime)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1276 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Indiana Packers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Stilson, Jaime)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1275 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Matthew Reiser on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Reiser, Craig)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1274 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #1273 Letter to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits. Permission granted. Parties may use up to 24,000 words for the upcoming class certification briefing. Each Class is allowed 24,000 total words for their opening and reply briefing and 24,000 words for Defendants' opposition to each Class's motion. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/29/2022.(HMA)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1273 LETTER to Request Permission to Exceed Word/Line Limits . (Clark, Brian)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1272 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1271 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Schwingler, Peter)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1271 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Seaboard Corporation Without Prejudice by Seaboard Corporation. Jointly Signed by ALDI, Inc.. (Schwingler, Peter)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H. Bergman on behalf of Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Supervalu, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Unified Grocers, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Bergman, Jeffrey)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1269 (Text-Only) ORDER/NOTICE: In view of the order from the Southern District of Indiana transferring the related motion to quash to this District (see Case No. 22-mc-26), the Court finds the jurisdictional arguments raised by Indiana Packers in their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel [ECF No. #1219 ] moot, and therefore Plaintiffs will not be required to file a reply brief on the issue of jurisdiction. [See ECF No. 1251 .] Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/26/2022.(MJA)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1268 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Margaret Mead. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9470418 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 4/26/2022 (JGK).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1267 FILED IN ERROR -r MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jordan C. Campbell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9470405 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 4/26/2022 (JGK).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charlene Koonce. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9470362 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 4/26/2022 (JGK).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1265 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lu on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Lu, Victoria)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1264 NOTICE of Appearance by Davida Sheri McGhee on behalf of Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC. (McGhee, Davida)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1263 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1198 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Nelson, Jessica)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1262 ORDER granting #1252 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Proposed Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. and Provisional Certification of Settlement Class. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/19/2022. (HMA)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 NOTICE of Appearance by Kacie Phillips on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Phillips, Kacie)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1260 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Notice of Withdrawal of Chase C. Keibler) (Eddy, David)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1259 ORDER on (1246 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal of Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/13/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:18-cv-02405-JRT-HB(HMA)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1258 NOTICE of Appearance by JeanAnn Tabbaa on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Tabbaa, JeanAnn)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1257 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM : Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2022 at 09:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Bourne, Joseph)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1256 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1252 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1255 Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter in Support of #1252 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Raiter, Shawn)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1254 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1252 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1253 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1252 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. : Date and time to be determined. (Raiter, Shawn)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1252 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 Text Only Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 4/8/2022 by Zoom audio. The Court and counsel discussed supplemental briefing needed in this matter. Plaintiffs will file no later than April 29, 2022, a reply memorandum that responds to Indiana Packers's jurisdictional arguments. Indiana Packers will file no later than April 29, 2022, a supplemental responsive memorandum addressing its substantive objections to the subpoena requests. The Court is not authorizing reply or surreply memoranda at this time, but if a party believes that a short reply or surreply would be of substantial assistance to the Court in preparing for the oral argument, it may make that request via email to chambers. Any such reply or surreply, if permitted, must be filed no later than 4 business days before the hearing. The hearing will be held by ZoomGov on May 9, 2022 at 9:00 AM, CT. Plaintiffs shall promptly file a Notice of Hearing to that effect. TIME: 8:00-8:16 AM. Counsel for Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs: Joseph C. Bourne. Counsel for Non-Party Indiana Packers Corporation: Jaime Stilson. (LNP)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1250 NOTICE of Appearance by Paulina Lisset Escobar on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Escobar, Paulina)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 NOTICE of Appearance by Logan Fancher on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Fancher, Logan)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Kane Lewis on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Lewis, Allison)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1247 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1246 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Bourne, Joseph)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., with Prejudice by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods LLC, Seaboard Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Bourne, Joseph)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1245 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #883 Motion to Compel(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/31/2022. (NBEH)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendant Smithfield Foods, Inc. (Rawicki, Bennett)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1243 NOTICE of Appearance by Ling Shan Wang on behalf of Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Wang, Ling)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1242 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline Greathouse on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Greathouse, Madeline)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1241 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Vissichelli on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Vissichelli, Allison)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Indiana Packers Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Stilson, Jaime)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1239 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Nicole Rivers on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Rivers, Andrea)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1238 FILED IN ERROR - NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Nicole Rivers on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Rivers, Andrea) Modified text on 3/28/2022 (JGK).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1237 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee Inc, Kroger Co., The, Save Mart Supermarkets, US Foods, Inc. . (Blechman, William)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1236 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Defendants' REPLY Letter Regarding Case Management Issues. (Taylor, Jarod)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1235 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1217 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (Heeman, Donald)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Defendants' Letter Following Up on March 16, 2022 Status Conference. (Taylor, Jarod)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1232 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico Direct Action Plaintiffs' Letter Following Up on March 16, 2022. (Bates, Kyle)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1231 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sysco Corporation Direct Action Plaintiffs' Letter Following Up on March 16, 2022 Status Conference. (Mitchell, Michael)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1230 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Logan T. Fancher. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9393863 filed by Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Schwingler, Peter) Modified text on 3/21/2022 (JGK).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1229 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paulina L. Escobar. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9393843 filed by Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Schwingler, Peter) Modified text on 3/21/2022 (JGK).
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #1226 Statement instead of Redacted Document - Entire Document Confidential/Impracticable to Redact,, #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM, #1220 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #1224 Declaration in Support, #1221 Meet and Confer Statement, #1223 Redacted Document, #1227 Proposed Order to Judge, (Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1227 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1226 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #1225 Sealed Document(s) - [1225-1] Exhibit 1, [1225-2] Exhibit 2, [1225-3] Exhibit 3, [1225-4] Exhibit 4, [1225-5] Exhibit 11, [1225-6] Exhibit 12, [1225-7] Exhibit 13, [1225-8] Exhibit 14, [1225-9] Exhibit 15, [1225-10] Exhibit 16, [1225-11] Exhibit 17, [1225-12] Exhibit 18, and [1225-13] Exhibit 19 filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 SEALED EXHIBIT List re #1224 Declaration in Support, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 11, #6 Exhibit(s) 12, #7 Exhibit(s) 13, #8 Exhibit(s) 14, #9 Exhibit(s) 15, #10 Exhibit(s) 16, #11 Exhibit(s) 17, #12 Exhibit(s) 18, #13 Exhibit(s) 19)(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1224 Declaration of Joseph C. Bourne in Support of #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4, #2 Exhibit(s) 5-10, #3 Exhibit(s) 11-19, #4 Exhibit(s) 20)(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1223 Redacted Document for #1222 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Indiana Packers Corporation filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1222 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1219 Motion to Compel, filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM : Date and time to be determined. (Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1219 MOTION to Compel INDIANA PACKERS CORPORATION TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bourne, Joseph)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1218 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1217 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (McGhee, Davida)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1217 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 3/16/2022 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (59 pages). Court Reporter: Paula Richter. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 3/24/2022. Redaction Request due 4/7/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/15/2022. (PKR)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1234 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 3/16/2022. (Court Reporter Paula Richter) (MJA)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1216 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (Bates, Kyle)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1215 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (Taylor, Jarod)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1214 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Paula Richter. (Mitchell, Michael)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1213 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1198 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Cotter, John)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER on (10 in 0:21-cv-01874-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal, (1203 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/10/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-01454-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-01874-JRT-HB(HMA)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER approving #1200 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/10/2022.(HMA)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1210 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited Daily Transcript (by 8am following day) for a COPY OF #1198 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Aberg, Lindsey)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1209 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Cohen on behalf of Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Cohen, Daniel)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1208 ORDER granting #1190 Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (HMA)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1207 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Status Conference to discuss case management and organization issues set for 03/16/2022 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. The conference is anticipated to last no longer than one hour. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/7/2022.Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(MJA)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1206 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC (Weeks, Andrew)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1205 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Cohen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9362246 filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn) Modified text on 3/4/2022 (JGK).
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1204 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1203 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (McCahill, Matthew)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1203 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Of Claims By The Action Meat Direct Action Plaintiffs And Direct Action Plaintiff Giant Eagle, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Action Meat Distributors, Inc., Giant Eagle Inc. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (McCahill, Matthew)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1202 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Holleran on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Holleran, Keith)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1201 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1200 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Hedlund, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiff Borhan Afoosi with Prejudice) by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Hedlund, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1198 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 2/4/2022 before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (44 pages). Court Reporter: Maria Weinbeck. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 2/23/2022. Redaction Request due 3/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2022. (MVW)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1197 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1082 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Johnson, Mark)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1196 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript for a COPY OF #1081 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Johnson, Mark)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1195 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1190 MOTION (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Bruckner, W)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of #1190 MOTION (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Bruckner, W)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner in Support of #1190 MOTION (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1192 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1190 MOTION (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1191 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1190 MOTION (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process) : Date and time to be determined. (Bruckner, W)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1190 MOTION (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Notice Plan and Claims Process) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bruckner, W)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Yifei Li (Finley, Alec)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1188 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. re MDL DAP Letter of February 11 2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Taylor, Jarod)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1187 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs , Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bourne, Joseph)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1186 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Cain-Mannix, Moira)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1185 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sysco Corporation Regarding Case Management Issues for Direct Action Plaintiff Cases. (Mitchell, Michael)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1184 EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Mitchell, Michael)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE EXPEDITED DAILY TRANSCRIPT SERVICES REQUEST to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Mitchell, Michael) Modified text on 2/11/2022 (kt).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1182 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. re Case Management issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Taylor, Jarod)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1181 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah L Jones on behalf of Sysco Corporation. (Jones, Sarah)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 1:22-385; District of Minnesota, 22-cv-367 JRT/HB. (CLK)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1179 NOTICE of Appearance by Abou Amara, Jr on behalf of Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Amara, Abou)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1178 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Brittany Resch) (Hedlund, Daniel)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1177 ORDER on (1149 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal of Seaboard Corporation without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/7/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB et al.(HMA)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1176 (Text-Only) ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Joint Letter Regarding Case Management Issues for Direct Action Plaintiff Cases [ECF No #1172 .] The Court grants the parties' request for an extension of time to file a joint letter reporting the outcome of their discussions about case management issues. [See ECF No. #1162 .] Counsel shall have until Friday, February 11, 2022, at noon CST to file their joint letter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/8/2022.(MJA)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1175 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Ripa on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Ripa, Jonathan)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1174 ORDER on #1170 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement Regarding Non-Party Trader Joe's Company's Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/7/2022.(LNP)
February 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 1/31/2022 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (103 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 2/14/2022. Redaction Request due 2/28/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2022. (EDD)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1199 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Status Conference held on 2/4/2022. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (HMA)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1172 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sysco Corporation Joint Letter Regarding Case Management Issues for Direct Action Plaintiff Cases. (Mitchell, Michael)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1171 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1170 Stipulation,,. (Scarlett, Shana)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 STIPULATION Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement Regarding Non-Party Trader Joe's Company's Materials by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, MDL Direct Action Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Clemens Food Group, Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Agri Stats, Inc., Trader Joe's Company. (Scarlett, Shana) Modified text on 2/7/2022 (ACH).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1162 Status Conference to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Aberg, Lindsey)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M Manning on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Manning, Jill)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #1162 Status Conference to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Thomson, William)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1166 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1162 Status Conference to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Cotter, John)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1165 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1162 Status Conference to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (McCahill, Matthew)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1164 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1162 Status Conference to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Heeman, Donald)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1163 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #1162 Status Conference to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Finley, Alec)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1161 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Gallup on behalf of Hormel Foods Corporation. (Gallup, Robert)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 (Text-Only) NOTICE: Status Conference set for 2/4/2022 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(HMA)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1159 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Koltookian on behalf of Hormel Foods Corporation. (Koltookian, Stephanie)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1158 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip Frederick Cramer on behalf of Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Supervalu, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Unified Grocers, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Cramer, Phillip)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1157 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1162 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Case Management Conference held on 1/31/2022. See minute entry for details. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (MJA)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1156 MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND ORDER CONCERNING #1155 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/31/2022.(LNP)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1155 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Protective Order (ECF No. #212 ) is AMENDED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/31/2022.(LNP)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1154 ORDER granting #1115 Motion for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/31/2022. (HMA)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1153 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian Edward Robison (Robison, Brian)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1152 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Deborah A. Elman filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Ferraro Foods, Inc.. (Eisler, Robert) Modified text on 2/1/2022 (CLK).
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1150 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1149 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Thomson, William)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1149 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Seaboard Corporation without Prejudice by Seaboard Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC. Jointly Signed by Action Meat Distributors, Inc., UniPro Foodservice, Inc., Conagra Brands, Inc., Nestle Purina Petcare Company, Nestle USA, Inc., Howard Samuels, Giant Eagle, Inc., and Central Grocers, Inc.. (Thomson, William)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1148 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Blechman on behalf of Albertsons Companies, Inc., Hy-Vee Inc, Kroger Co., The, Save Mart Supermarkets, US Foods, Inc.. (Blechman, William)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1151 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 1/27/2022 re #1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion granted. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (HMA)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1146 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs of In Camera Submission (Bourne, Joseph)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1145 NOTICE by Smithfield Foods, Inc. of Compliance with the Class Action Fairness Act (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Robison, Brian)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1144 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P McCahill on behalf of Action Meat Distributors, Inc.. (McCahill, Matthew)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1143 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Plaintiffs Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Supervalu, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Unified Grocers, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Germaine, David)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L. Menger on behalf of Buffalo Wild Wings Inc., CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc., Cheney Brothers, Inc., Jimmy John's Buying Group SPV, LLC, Restaurant Services, Inc., Sonic Industries Services, Inc., Subway Protein Litigation Crop., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Litigation Trust, Wawa, Inc.. (Menger, Scott)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1141 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. #1115 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Pearson, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 EXHIBIT (Amended Exhibit A and B to Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc.) re #1119 Declaration in Support, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B Smithfield Assignment Report)(Pearson, Michael)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1139 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Max Samels. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9282662 filed by Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC. (McGhee, Davida) Modified text on 1/31/2022 (ABR).
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1138 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Boxbaum on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Boxbaum, Brandon)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenina Jih Nin Lee on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Lee, Kenina)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1136 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (FILED JOINTLY). (Bourne, Joseph)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1135 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Frederick Kopp on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Kopp, Christopher)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1134 NOTICE of Appearance by John Matthew Butler on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Butler, John)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1133 AMENDED PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Order Granting Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Motion For Final Approval Of The Class Action Settlement With Smithfield Foods, Inc. And Entry Of Final Judgment #1115 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Pearson, Michael) Modified text on 1/24/2022 (CLK).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1132 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. (Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice Of Filing Amended Exhibits To The Declaration Of Eric Schachter In Support Of Their Motion For Final Approval Of The Settlement With Smithfield Foods, Inc.) (Attachments: #1ATTACHMENTS FILED IN ERROR. REQUESTED REFILING USING PROPER EVENT. Exhibit(s) A to Schachter Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) B to Schachter Declaration)(Pearson, Michael) Modified text on 1/24/2022 (CLK).
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1131 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of California, 3:21-10038; District of Minnesota, 22-cv-71 JRT/HB. (kt)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney filed by Action Meat Distributors, Inc.. (Manion, Ryan) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (kt).
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto Rodriguez on behalf of Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Supervalu, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Unified Grocers, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Rodriguez, Alberto)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1128 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Germaine on behalf of Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dolgencorp, LLC, Dollar General Corporation, Meijer Distribution, Inc., Meijer, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, Supervalu, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Unified Grocers, Inc., United Natural Foods, Inc., Wakefern Food Corp.. (Germaine, David)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1127 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Vanek on behalf of Associated Grocers of the South, Inc., Dollar General Corporation, Dolgencorp, LLC, Meijer, Inc., Meijer Distribution, Inc., Publix Super Markets, Inc., Raley's, United Natural Foods, Inc., Supervalu, Inc., Associated Grocers of Florida, Inc., Unified Grocers, Inc., Tony's Fine Foods, Wakefern Food Corp.. (Vanek, Joseph)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER on #1124 Stipulation Correcting Order (ECF No. #1102 ) on Consent for Leave to file Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/19/2022.(LNP)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1125 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1124 Stipulation,,. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1124 STIPULATION re #1102 Order on Stipulation, Add and Terminate Parties Stipulation Correcting Order (ECF No. 1102) on Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Seaboard Foods LLC, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1123 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of California, 3:21-cv-10038; District of Minnesota, 22-cv-71 JRT/HB. (kt)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1122 NOTICE by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Joint Agenda for January 31, 2022 Status Conference (Robison, Brian)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1121 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of California, 5:21-cv-10037; District of Minnesota, 22-cv-72 JRT/HB. (MMP) Modified text on 1/14/2022 (MMP).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement with Smithfield Foods, Inc. #1115 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Bruckner, W)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1119 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of #1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Bruckner, W)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1118 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner in Support of #1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1116 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. : Motion Hearing set for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Bruckner, W)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1115 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bruckner, W)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1114 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kenina J. Lee. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9264760 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (NAH).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1113 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brandon T. Boxbaum. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9264740 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (NAH).
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1112 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) (MMP)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1111 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Sealed Version] against Hormel Foods Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., Hatfield Quality Meats, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., JBS USA Food Company, Tyson Foods, Inc.. filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. No summons requested. (Berman, Steve)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1110 REDACTED DOCUMENT for #1111 SEALED AMENDED COMPLAINT Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Redacted Version] against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hatfield Quality Meats, Inc., Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. No summons requested. (Berman, Steve) Modified text on 1/13/2022 (CLK).
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1109 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Faler, Sierra)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1108 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Scheiderer, Megan)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1107 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Glenn, Ryann)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1106 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Hasan, Kamron)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1105 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Jensen, Marnie)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sarah Zimmerman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9259609 filed by Triumph Foods, LLC. (Chapin, Aaron) Modified text on 1/18/2022 (NAH).
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1103 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Letter Update Regarding the Parties' Negotiations Concerning Amendments to the Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, Pac-Agri Proposed Amendments, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, Table of Parties' Positions)(McFarland, Ian)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1102 ORDER on #1099 Stipulation of Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 1/7/2022.(LNP)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1101 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1099 Stipulation,,. (Scarlett, Shana)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibits A-B to Stipulation of Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint re #1099 Stipulation,, by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(Scarlett, Shana)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1099 STIPULATION of Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C - Redacted, #2 Exhibit(s) D - Redacted)(Scarlett, Shana)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1098 ORDER re (11 in 0:21-cv-02510-JRT-HB, 1092 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Order on Stipulation. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02510-JRT-HB(HMA) Modified text on 1/4/2022 (CLK).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1097 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #1005 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Debra Beauvais. (Nelson, Jessica)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER on (1070 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02513-JRT-HB (HMA)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER on (1068 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02512-JRT-HB (HMA)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1093 ORDER on (1066 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02511-JRT-HB (HMA)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1092 FILED IN ERROR. WILL REFILE.(Text-Only) ORDER on (1064 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02510-JRT-HB (HMA) Modified text on 1/4/2022 (CLK).
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1091 ORDER on (1062 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02509-JRT-HB (HMA)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1090 ORDER on (1060 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-02508-JRT-HB(HMA)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER on (1058 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal,. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-01605-JRT-HB(HMA)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1088 ORDER on (1056 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/3/2022.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:21-cv-01373-JRT-HB(HMA)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1087 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Manion on behalf of Unipro Foodservice, Inc. (Manion, Ryan) Modified text on 12/30/2021 (lmb).
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 1:21-cv-06553; District of Minnesota, 21-cv-02757-JRT-HB. (lmb)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10) (lmb)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sysco Corporation Request for Oral Argument by MDL Direct Action Plaintiffs. (Mitchell, Michael)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1083 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #1074 Status Conference to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Manion, Ryan)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 TRANSCRIPT of Informal Dispute Resolution Conference held on 12/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (32 pages). Court Reporter: Lynne Krenz. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 12/29/2021. Redaction Request due 1/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2022. (LMK)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (31 pages). Court Reporter: Lynne Krenz. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 12/29/2021. Redaction Request due 1/12/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2022. (LMK)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1080 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1074 Status Conference to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Hall, Isaac)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1074 Status Conference to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Thomson, William)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #1074 Status Conference, #1073 Order on Motion to Compel,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Aberg, Lindsey)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1077 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #1074 Status Conference to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Clark, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #1074 Status Conference to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Heeman, Donald)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #1073 Order on Motion to Compel,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lynne Krenz. (Finley, Alec)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER/NOTICE:Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2022 at 01:00 PM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/20/2021.(MJA)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1074 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: IDR Conference on MDL DAPs' letter #1022 and Defendants' letter #1035 held on 12/17/2021. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (MJA)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1073 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2021 re #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. The Court granted the motion. SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND DETAILS. (Court Reporter Lynne Krenz) (MJA)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1071 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1070 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Restaurant Services, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Restaurant Services, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1068 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Wawa, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Wawa, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1067 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1066 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1066 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by CKE Restaurants Holdings, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1064 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Sonic Industries Services, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Sonic Industries Services, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1062 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Jimmy John's Buying Group SPV, LLC Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Jimmy John's Buying Group SPV, LLC. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1060 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1060 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Buffalo Wild Wings Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1058 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Subway Protein Litigation Corp. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Subway Protein Litigation Crop., as Litigation Trustee of the Subway Protein Litigation Trust. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1056 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Esau, David)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1056 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Claims by Cheney Brothers, Inc. Against Defendant JBS USA Food Company by Cheney Brothers, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Esau, David)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1054 NOTICE of Appearance by Pooja Patel on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Patel, Pooja)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1053 NOTICE of Appearance by Bennett Rawicki on behalf of Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Rawicki, Bennett)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Todt on behalf of Hormel Foods Corporation. (Todt, Jonathan)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1051 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Yi on behalf of Hormel Foods Corporation. (Yi, John)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1050 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL for Howard B. Samuels. (Eddy, David) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (CLK). Modified text on 12/15/2021 (CLK).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica J Nelson on behalf of JBS USA Food Company. (Nelson, Jessica)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Yi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9208445 filed by Hormel Foods Corporation. (Chow, Emily) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (NAH).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1047 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan H. Todt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9208407 filed by Hormel Foods Corporation. (Chow, Emily) Modified text on 12/15/2021 (NAH).
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 12/10/2021 re #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motions taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HMA)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1046 REPORT Joint Statement of The Parties In The Direct Action Plaintiff Cases Regarding Case Management Issues In Response to The Courts Consolidation Order Dkt. 985 by Sysco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Pretrial Case Management and Scheduling Order Applicable to MDL Direct Action Plaintiff Cases, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Mitchell, Michael)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 DECLARATION of Brian Riaparbelli in Opposition to #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. filed by Pacific Agri-Products, Inc..(Sawyer, Adrian)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. filed by Pacific Agri-Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Word Count Compliance)(Sawyer, Adrian)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kari Wohlschlegel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9199414 filed by JBS USA Food Company. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1042 NOTICE REGARDING HUANG'S OPENING ARGUMENT FOR HEARING by Shiyang Huang (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Qc'd on 1/26/2022 (KNK).
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Matthew Butler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9198860 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Minae Yu. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9195694 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1039 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rod Stone. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9195663 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1038 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bennett Rawicki. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9195648 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pooja Patel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9195629 filed by Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Cotter, John) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Direct Action Plaintiffs' letter requesting an IDR conference (ECF No. #1022 ) in this matter, and stating that Defendants agree to submit the identified issues through IDR. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will conduct the IDR conference by ZoomGov on December 17, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. or as soon thereafter as the Court concludes the hearing on the CIIPs Motion to Compel. Zoom access information will be circulated to counsel a few days before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/8/2021.(LNP)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9) (kt)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Defendants' IDR Letter in Response to MDL DAPs regarding Search Term Negotiations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Tyson's Agreed Upon Search Terms, #2 Exhibit(s) 11/19/2021 M. Singer email to C. Smith & H. Christenson)(Rohrbaugh, Tiffany)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Eastern District of New York, 1:21-cv-06329; District of Minnesota, 21-cv-2617 JRT/HB. (kt)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Sutton. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9192775 filed by JBS USA Food Company. (Nelson, Jessica) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 (Text-Only) ORDER in Response to #1023 Letter to District Judge. The deadline to move to amend an order or object in writing to applicaton of an order from either case 18-1776 or 21-2998 is extended to 12/10/2021. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 12/7/2021.(HMA)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle Taylor. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9190281 filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Looby, Michelle) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (NAH).
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs re #1026 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #1027 Declaration in Support, #1025 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #1028 Meet and Confer Statement, #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc., #1029 Proposed Order to Judge - Other (McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1024 Motion to Compel. (McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #1024 Motion to Compel filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 Declaration of Ian F. McFarland in Support of #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. : Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2021 at 01:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed to Pacific Agri-Products, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (McFarland, Ian)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. re extension of time to file objections or requests to amend orders under Memorandum Opinion and Order Consolidating Actions (ECF No. 985) and to file joint status report. (Taylor, Jarod)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sysco Corporation Informal Dispute Resolution Request on behalf of MDL Direct Action Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Mitchell, Michael)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER on (983 in 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB) Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 12/1/2021.Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01776-JRT-HB, 0:19-cv-01578-JRT-HB (HMA)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #1011 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heather K. Christenson for JBS USA Food Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/30/2021. (JGK)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 ORDER on #1016 Stipulation Concerning Expert Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/30/2021.(LNP)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER on #1014 Stipulation Concerning Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/30/2021.(LNP)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1016 Stipulation,. (Bourne, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 STIPULATION Concerning Expert Discovery by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, All other Plaintiffs, and All Defendants. (Bourne, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1014 Stipulation,. (Bourne, Joseph)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 STIPULATION Concerning Depositions by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, All other Plaintiffs, and All Defendants. (Bourne, Joseph)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Stephanie A. Chen (Clark, Brian)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation & Resetting of Hearing: #991 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim is canceled. Motion Hearing is now set for 12/10/2021 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. Notice to Public: Please visit our website at #https://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/court-schedules for audio connection information for this hearing. Note that hearings might not appear on the court schedule or courthouse kiosk until one week before the hearing date.(HMA)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Heather Christenson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9163794 filed by JBS USA Food Company. (Nelson, Jessica)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 OPPOSITION TO FINAL APPROVAL re #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Shiyang Huang. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Qc'd on 12/14/2021 (KNK).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 TRANSCRIPT of Motion for Approval of Settlement via Video Conference held on 11/3/2021 before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (18 pages). Court Reporter: Kristine Mousseau. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 11/29/2021. Redaction Request due 12/10/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2022. (KM)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Northern District of Illinois, 1:21-cv-05883; District of Minnesota, 21-cv-2526 JRT/HB. (kt) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (kt).
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER granting #965 CIIPP's Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with the JBS Defendants and Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/18/2021. (HMA)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER granting #915 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/18/2021. (HMA)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 6/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (33 pages). Court Reporter: Debra Beauvais. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 11/29/2021. Redaction Request due 12/9/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2022. (DKB)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 21-82032; District of Minnesota, 21-2513 JRT/HB. (kt)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 21-82031; District of Minnesota, 21-2512 JRT/HB. (kt)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 21-82027; District of Minnesota, 21-2511 JRT/HB. (kt)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 21-82018; District of Minnesota, 21-2510. (kt)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from Southern District of Florida, 21-82017; District of Minnesota, 21-2509 JRT/HB. (kt)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 999 EXHIBIT re #998 Notice filed by Shiyang Huang.(MTP) Document QC'd on 1/4/2022 (MTP).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 998 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF HUANG OBJECTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION DEFECTS [ECF 948] by Shiyang Huang re #948 Objection (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Document QC'd on 1/4/2022 (MTP).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 997 (Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Receipt of record from the Southern District of Florida, 9:21-82015; District of Minnesota, 21-cv-2508 JRT/HB. (kt) Modified text on 11/18/2021 (kt).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 996 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 995 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #990 Motion for Approval of Settlement, filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 994 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-E)(Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 993 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Support of #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 992 MEMORANDUM in Support re #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 991 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 990 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 989 RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT REQUESTS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 21-MD-2998 JRT/HB. (Attachments: #1 Transcript Request (11), #2 Transcript Request (12), #3 Transcript Request (24))(kt)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 988 NOTICE OF DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN 21-md-2998 JRT/HB re #985 Order to Consolidate Cases. (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (2), #2 Notice (4), #3 Letter to Magistrate Judge with Exhibits A-G (5), #4 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (8), #5 Minute Entry (9), #6 Ceritifed Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (13), #7 Transcript (14), #8 Ceritifed Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (15), #9 Stipulation (16), #10 Proposed Order (17), #11 Protective Order (18), #12 Stipulation (19), #13 Order on Stipulation (21), #14 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (22), #15 Notice of Appearance (25), #16 Notice of Appearance (26), #17 Notice of Appearance (27), #18 Notice of Appearance (28), #19 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (30), #20 Brief (31), #21 Brief (32), #22 Brief (33), #23 Declaration with Exhibits A and B (34), #24 Brief (35), #25 Brief (36), #26 Declaration with Exhibits 1-3 (37), #27 Notice of Withdrawal (39), #28 Notice of Appearance (40), #29 Stipulation (41), #30 Proposed Order (42), #31 Order on Stipulation (43), #32 Report (44), #33 Stipulation (45), #34 Proposed Order (46), #35 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (47), #36 Order on Stipulation (48), #37 Stipulation (49), #38 Proposed Order (50), #39 Order on Stipulation (51), #40 Amended Complaint (52), #41 Order Consolidating Actions (53), #42 Docket Sheet (21md2998))(kt)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 987 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #980 Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Aberg, Lindsey)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 986 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript of #980 Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Nelson, Jessica)
November 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 985 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/12/2021.(HMA)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 984 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #983 Stipulation,. (Lee-O'Halloran, Patrick)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 983 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.'s and Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC's Claims Against JBS USA Food Company with Prejudice by Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Lee-O'Halloran, Patrick)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 982 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Bart Cohen (Clark, Brian)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER approving #976 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 11/10/2021.(HMA)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 980 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2021 re #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motions granted. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HMA)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 979 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #976 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Finley, Alec)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 978 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Attorney's Fees and Costs #965 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Raiter, Shawn)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 977 AMENDED DECLARATION OF SHAWN M. RAITER in SUPPORT of #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - 28 USC 1715 Notice)(Raiter, Shawn) Modified text on 11/4/2021 (CLK).
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 976 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Betty's Eat Shop, Confetti's, Ziggy's BBQ Smokehouse & Ice Cream Parlor, LLC. Jointly Signed by Confetti's, Ziggy's BBQ Smokehouse & Ice Cream Parlor, LLC, and Betty's Eat Shop. (Finley, Alec)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 975 (Text-Only) ORDER granting #972 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacob Bylund for Hormel Foods Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/28/2021. (JGK)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 974 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Whitney E. Street (Clark, Brian)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 973 OPPOSITION TO #951 MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AS MOOT by Shiyang Huang (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MTP) Qc'd on 11/5/2021 (KNK).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 972 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob D. Bylund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9098918 filed by Hormel Foods Corporation. (Chow, Emily)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 971 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 970 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari in Support of #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-6)(Raiter, Shawn)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 969 Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter in Support of #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 968 MEMORANDUM in Support re #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 967 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #965 Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 966 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS : Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Raiter, Shawn)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 965 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 964 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a 30-Day Transcript of #795 Status Conference to Court Reporter Debra Beauvais. (Aberg, Lindsey)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 963 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #839 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Aberg, Lindsey)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 962 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 961 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #949 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 960 Declaration of Carl V. Malmstrom in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Declaration of Kenneth A. Wexler in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 958 Declaration of Kevin Landau in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 957 Declaration of Simon Paris in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 956 Declaration of Ashlea Schwarz in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 955 Declaration of Dianne M. Nast in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 954 Declaration of Brian D. Penny in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 953 Declaration of Daniel C. Hedlund in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 952 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Support of #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 951 MEMORANDUM in Support re #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 950 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses : Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Scarlett, Shana)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 949 MOTION for Attorney Fees Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Expenses filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 948 OBJECTION TO CLASS CERTIFICATION by Shiyang Huang (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MTP) Document QCd on 11/9/2021 (MMG).
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER granting #946 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 885, 887, 887-1, 887-2, 930. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 10/20/2021 unless further timely submissions are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/22/2021. (LNP)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 946 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #885 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #887 SEALED Declaration of Joseph C. Bourne, #930 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 filed by Hormel Foods Corporation. (Coleman, Craig) Modified text on 9/22/2021 (CLK).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 945 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (53 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 9/23/2021. Redaction Request due 10/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2021. (LAS)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 944 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #940 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Nelson, Jessica)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 943 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #940 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Jethmalani, Kail)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 942 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #940 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Hall, Isaac)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 941 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 7-Day Transcript of #940 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Clark, Brian)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 939 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #936 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jenna Stupar for Clemens Food Group, LLC and for The Clemens Family Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/8/2021. (JGK)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2021 re #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (MJA)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 938 REPORT WINN-DIXIE PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH THIS COURT'S BRIEFING ORDER DKT. #23 by Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. (Bell, Theodore) Modified text on 9/8/2021 (lmb).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 937 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on three motions filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. concerning a subpoena served on behalf of the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (CIIPPs) (ECF Nos. #848 , #855 , #859 ). On July 30, 2021, the Court suspended briefing on those motions and ordered counsel for Cash-Wa and the CIIPPs to meet and confer and for Cash-Wa to file an updated meet and confer statement, after which the court would issue a briefing schedule. (ECF No. 863 .) Since then, nothing further has been filed. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cash-Wa's motions (ECF Nos. #848 , #855 , #859 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If disputes remain after counsel has completed their good faith meet and confer, Cash-Wa may file a new motion with regard to those disputes. Cash-Wa is reminded to comply with the Local Rules for the District of Minnesota and this Court's Practice Pointers, including but not limited to the requirement that it obtain a hearing date from the chambers of the undersigned before filing any such motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/3/2021. (LNP)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 936 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jenna Marie Stupar. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8999484 filed by Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation. (Johnson, Mark)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER denying #876 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/3/2021. (MJA)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 934 Reply to Response to Motion re #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Finley, Alec)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 933 TEXT ONLY ORDER in Response to #932 Letter to Magistrate Judge. This matter is before the Court on the letter from the CIIPPs (ECF No. #932 ) requesting permission to file a reply to Affiliated Foods' response to the CIIPPs' Motion to Compel Compliance With Subpoena (ECF No. #876 ). The Court GRANTS the request, provided that, in view of the date of the hearing and the intervening holiday weekend, the CIIPPs' reply must be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. Central time on September 3, 2021, and should include a response to Affiliated Foods' argument that this Court is not the proper forum to hear a motion pertaining to the subpoena absent consent of the parties (which the Court understands has not been given) or an order from the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas transferring such a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/2/2021.(LNP)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 932 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs Requesting Permission to File Reply Memorandum. (Johnson, Jason)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 931 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Impracticable to Redact for #930 Sealed Document(s) - #930 Sealed Exhibit 1 filed by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC.(Coleman, Craig)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 930 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #929 Exhibit, filed by HORMEL FOODS CORPORATION AND HORMEL FOODS, LLC.(Coleman, Craig)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 929 EXHIBIT EXHIBIT INDEX re #927 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4, #4 Exhibit(s) 5, #5 Exhibit(s) 6, #6 Exhibit(s) 7, #7 Exhibit(s) 8, #8 Exhibit(s) 9, #9 Exhibit(s) 10, #10 Exhibit(s) 11)(Coleman, Craig)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 928 DECLARATION of Amy Morrison re #927 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC . (Coleman, Craig)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 927 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Coleman, Craig)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 926 DECLARATION of Kathryn A. Stephens in Opposition to #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Jerry Adwell, Nathan Annis, Steven Binder, Paul Bogle, Corwyn Bollum, Jessica Chenoweth, Mark Coffey, Thomas Day, Jeffrey Ettinger, Bryan Farnsworth, Jody Feragen, James Fiala, Michael Gyarmaty, Jana Haynes, Lance Hoefflin, Neal Hull, Jesse Hylland, Jennifer Johnson, Holly La Vallie, Glenn Leitch, Albert Lieberum Jr, Alan Meiergerd, Paul Peil, Jose Rojas, Jim Sheehan, James Snee, William Snyder, Eric Steinbach, Donald Temperley, Steven Venenga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G)(Stephens, Kathryn)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 925 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Paul Bogle, Jessica Chenoweth, Paul Peil, Corwyn Bollum, Lance Hoefflin, Donald Temperley, Alan Meiergerd, Bryan Farnsworth, Glenn Leitch, Albert Lieberum Jr, Eric Steinbach, Holly La Vallie, James Fiala, Jana Haynes, Jennifer Johnson, James Snee, Jeffrey Ettinger, Jerry Adwell, Jesse Hylland, Jody Feragen, Mark Coffey, Jim Sheehan, Jose Rojas, Michael Gyarmaty, Nathan Annis, Steven Binder, Thomas Day, Neal Hull, Steven Venenga, William Snyder.(Stephens, Kathryn)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 924 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. filed by Affiliated Foods, Inc..(Mullin, David)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 923 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 922 Declaration of David Cialkowski in Support of #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 921 Declaration of Jon Tostrud in Support of #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 920 Declaration of Jonathan Cuneo in Support of #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 919 Declaration of Marcus Bozeman in Support of #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 918 Declaration of Don Barrett in Support of #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 917 Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter in Support of #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A and B)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 916 MEMORANDUM in Support re #915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
August 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 915 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, Set Aside for Future Litigation Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 914 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Hart on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., Maplevale Farms, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Hart, Steven)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 913 NOTICE of Appearance by John Shannon Marrese on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., Maplevale Farms, Inc., Olean Wholesale Grocery Cooperative, Inc.. (Marrese, John)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 912 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #905 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven Hart for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs; granting #906 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Shannon Marrese for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/27/2021. (NAH)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 911 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian F. McFarland on behalf of Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (McFarland, Ian)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 910 BRIEFING ORDER re: #876 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 9/1/2021. Motion Hearing reset for 9/8/2021 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/26/2021.(MJA)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 909 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #882 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Pearson for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs; granting #892 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kail Jethmalani for Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and for Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/25/2021. (NAH)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 908 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kyle Pozan (Pozan, Kyle)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 907 ORDER granting #875 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abraham James Spung for Triumph Foods, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/25/2021. (NAH)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 906 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John S. Marrese. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8971840 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Clark, Brian)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 905 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven A. Hart. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8971765 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Clark, Brian)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 904 ORDER granting #900 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #900 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for all parties to respond to the Class Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel is set for August 21, 2021. The hearing scheduled for 9/10/2021 at 03:00 PM is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/23/2021. (LNP)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 903 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #900 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC.(Coleman, Craig)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 902 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #900 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC.(Coleman, Craig)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 901 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #900 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply : Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Coleman, Craig)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 900 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC. (Coleman, Craig)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 899 BRIEF re 869 Briefing Order,, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Court's August 5, 2021 Briefing Order. (Finley, Alec)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 898 DECLARATION of Shana E. Scarlett re #897 Brief by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Scarlett, Shana)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 897 BRIEF re 869 Briefing Order,, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Court's August 5, 2021 Briefing Order. (Scarlett, Shana)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 896 BRIEF re 869 Briefing Order,, Defendants' Brief Regarding Consolidation. (Graham, David)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 895 BRIEF REGARDING CONSOLIDATION OF MDL CASES WITH THE PRE-EXISTING CASES filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Shiftan, Benjamin)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 894 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Ernest Shiftan on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Shiftan, Benjamin)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 893 TEXT ONLY AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING on #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. Motion Hearing reset for 8/31/2021 at 10:30 AM by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (LNP)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 892 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kail J. Jethmalani. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8959783 filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Graham, David)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 891 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs re #884 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #888 Redacted Document, #890 Proposed Order to Judge, #889 Meet and Confer Statement, #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, #886 Redacted Document (Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 890 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 889 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #883 Motion to Compel, filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 888 Redacted Document for #887 Sealed Declaration filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) 1-3, 5-13, and 15-17, #3 Redacted Exhibit 4, #4 Statement regarding Sealed Exhibit 14)(Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 887 SEALED Declaration of Joseph C. Bourne in Support of #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Sealed Exhibit 4, #2 Sealed Exhibit 14)(Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Redacted Document for #885 Sealed Memorandum filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 885 SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support re #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 884 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs : Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2021 at 03:30 PM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Bourne, Joseph)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 883 MOTION to Compel HORMEL TO PRODUCE RESPONSIVE TEXT MESSAGE CONTENT AND TO ENFORCE SUBPOENAS TO HORMEL CUSTODIANS Jointly Filed with Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bourne, Joseph)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 882 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew A. Pearson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8957119 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Melissa)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 881 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Declaration of Anthony M. Carter in Support of #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Finley, Alec)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 879 MEMORANDUM in Support re #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Finley, Alec)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 878 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #876 Motion to Compel filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 877 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. : Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 at 10:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Finley, Alec)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 876 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Directed To Affiliated Foods, Inc. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Finley, Alec)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 875 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney A. James Spung. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8949924 filed by Triumph Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Chapin, Aaron)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 874 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #839 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Scarlett, Shana)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 873 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #839 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Aberg, Lindsey)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 872 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Johnson on behalf of Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Johnson, Jason)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 871 NOTICE of Appearance by William Thomson on behalf of Seaboard Foods, LLC. (Thomson, William)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 870 AMENDED ORDER re #868 Order on Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. Final Fairness Hearing set for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Long Form Notice, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Email Notice, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Summary Publication Notice)(HMA)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 869 (Text-Only) BRIEFING ORDER: The Court discussed whether In re Pork Antitrust Litigation (ECF18-cv-1776) and In re Pork Antitrust Litigation (ECF21-md-2998) should be consolidated at the July 14, 2021 Status Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs from ECF18-cv-1776, the Direct Action Plaintiffs from ECF21-md-2998, and Defendants shall file simultaneous briefs addressing the question of consolidation fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order. Briefs due by 8/19/2021. Ordered by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/5/2021.(HMA)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 868 ORDER granting #828 Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Smithfield Foods, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 8/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Long Form Notice, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Email Notice, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Summary Publication Notice) (HMA)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 867 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #841 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Scott Lundering for Joe Lopez; granting #846 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andrew Weeks for Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/3/2021. (NAH)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 866 Redacted Document for #865 Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . (Berman, Steve)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 865 SEALED Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint re #864 Order on Stipulation by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ORDER on #779 Stipulation of Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/3/2021.(LNP)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 863 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Cash-Wa Distributing Co.'s motions concerning a subpoena served on behalf of the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs (CIIPPs) (ECF Nos. #848 , #855 , #859 ). It appears that the parties have not had an opportunity to meet and confer regarding the issues raised by the motions (see ECF Nos. #851 , #857 , #861 ). Furthermore, Cash-Wa's counsel did not obtain a hearing date for the motions before filing them. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) counsel for Cash-Wa and the CIIPPs shall promptly meet and confer in good faith on the issues raised by the motions; (2) Cash-Wa shall file a single updated meet and confer statement as to all three motions, reporting in detail on the results of that meet and confer and stating what, if any, issues remain and proposing an agreed briefing schedule as to the issues that do remain; and (3) the deadline for the CIIPPs to respond to the motions shall be suspended until the Court issues a briefing order after reviewing the updated meet and confer statement and proposed briefing schedule. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/30/2021.(LNP)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 862 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #859 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 861 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #859 Motion for Extension of Time (General) filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 860 MEMORANDUM in Support re #859 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 859 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 858 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #855 MOTION Leave to File Objections Out of Time filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 857 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #855 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 856 MEMORANDUM in Support re #855 MOTION Leave to File Objections Out of Time filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 855 MOTION Leave to File Objections Out of Time filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 854 MEMORANDUM in Support re #848 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate )(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 853 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #848 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 852 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #848 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 851 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #848 Motion to Quash filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC.(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 850 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew D. Weeks in SUPPORT OF #848 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Subpoena)(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 849 MEMORANDUM in Support re #848 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 848 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 847 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Sophie Roz Sedaghat (Warshaw, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 846 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew D. Weeks. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8917178 filed by Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 845 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Motion For Preliminary Approval Of The Class Action Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs And Smithfield Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Bruckner, W)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 844 NOTICE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Notice of Filing [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Their Motion For Preliminary Approval Of The Class Action Settlement With Smithfield Foods, Inc. (Bruckner, W)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 843 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R Mitchell on behalf of Cash-Wa Distributing Co. of Fargo, LLC. (Mitchell, Daniel)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 842 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF #839 Transcript(s) to Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau. (Hall, Isaac)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 841 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Lundering. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8914858 filed by Joe Lopez. (Raiter, Shawn)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 840 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(CLK)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 839 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing via Video Conference held on 7/14/2021 before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (33 pages). Court Reporter: Kristine Mousseau. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 8/3/2021. Redaction Request due 8/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/27/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2021. (KM)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER granting #822 Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Class Action Settlement with the JPS Defendants and Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B) (HMA)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 837 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Motion Hearing held on 7/26/2021 re #822 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF AND THE JBS DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Motion granted. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HMA)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 836 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #822 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Exclusion Report, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Assignment Report)(Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 835 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim: Status Conference held on 7/14/2021. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (HMA)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 834 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #828 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A -C)(Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 833 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #828 Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 832 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of #828 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibits A - E)(Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 831 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner in Support of #828 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 830 MEMORANDUM in Support re #828 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 829 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #828 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. : Date and time to be determined. (Bruckner, W)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 828 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFFS AND SMITHFIELD FOODS, INC. filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bruckner, W)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 827 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of #822 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF AND THE JBS DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Bruckner, W)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 826 Declaration of W. Joseph Bruckner in Support of #822 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF AND THE JBS DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 825 MEMORANDUM in Support re #822 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF AND THE JBS DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bruckner, W)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #822 Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Bruckner, W)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 823 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #822 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF AND THE JBS DEFENDANTS : Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15 (MPLS) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Bruckner, W)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 822 MOTION for Approval of Settlement FINAL SETTLEMENT BETWEEN DIRECT PURCHASER PLAINTIFF AND THE JBS DEFENDANTS filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bruckner, W)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 821 TEXT ONLY ORDER: In view of the case management conference in all In Re Pork related cases that will be held in the near future before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim, the case management conference that was set for July 15, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Central time before Magistrate Judge Bowbeer, is CANCELLED, and no further submissions required by Judge Bowbeer for that conference need be filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/9/2021.(LNP)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 820 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Letter Regarding Defendants' Coordination and Scheduling Proposal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Robison, Brian)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 819 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Class Plaintiffs' Coordination and Scheduling Proposal. (Wagner, Arielle)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 818 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Joint Agenda For Hearing and Case Management Conference on July 15, 2021. (Wagner, Arielle)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 817 TEXT ONLY ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the letter from counsel in In Re Pork Antitrust Litigation, 18-cv-1776 (ECF No. #814 ), recommending that counsel for the parties in Cheney Bros. v. Agri Stats, et al, 21-cv-1373 (JRT/HB), Sysco Corp. v. Agri Stats, et al, 21-cv-1374 (JRT/HB), and Action Meat Distributors v. Agri Stats, et al, 21-cv-1454 (JRT/HB), all of which were recently transferred to this district by conditional transfer order in connection with the recently created MDL In Re: Pork Antitrust Litigation, 21-md-2998 (JRT/HB), be included in the case management conference that has been scheduled for July 15, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. Central time (ECF No. #796 ). The Court agrees, and accordingly IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the parties in the Cheney Bros., Sysco, and Action Meat cases shall attend the July 15, 2021 case management conference, which shall be conducted by Zoom. Instructions for accessing the Zoom conference will be provided to counsel in all cases a few days before the conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their coordination and scheduling proposals no later than 5:00 p.m. Central time on July 8, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/1/2021.(LNP)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 816 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen J Teti (Teti, Stephen)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 815 NOTICE of Settlement Smithfield Foods, Inc. by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs (Clark, Brian)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 814 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. regarding July 15 Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robison, Brian)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 813 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Seaboard Foods LLC (Woodruff, Jon)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER granting #802 Motion to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/22/2021. (HMA) Modified text on 6/23/2021 (HMA).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER granting #773 Consumer Indirect Plaintiffs' Motion to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 6/22/2021. (HMA)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 810 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. on behalf of Class Plaintiffs and Defendants regarding update on timing of structured data productions. (Taylor, Jarod)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER granting #797 Class Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Order Permitting Production of Documents by Third Party Compeer Financial, ACA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/16/2021. (LNP)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 808 AMENDED COMPLAINT Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. No summons requested. (Finley, Alec)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 807 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #802 MOTION to Approve Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 806 Declaration of Cameron R. Azari in Support of #802 MOTION to Approve Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 805 MEMORANDUM in Support re #802 MOTION to Approve Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 804 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #802 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 803 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #802 MOTION to Approve Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants : Date and time to be determined. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 802 MOTION to Approve Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 801 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #797 MOTION For an Order Permitting Production of Documents by Third Party Compeer Financial, ACA (Unopposed) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Wagner, Arielle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 800 Declaration of Stephen M. Owen in Support of #797 MOTION For an Order Permitting Production of Documents by Third Party Compeer Financial, ACA (Unopposed) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Wagner, Arielle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 799 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #797 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Wagner, Arielle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 798 MEMORANDUM in Support re #797 MOTION For an Order Permitting Production of Documents by Third Party Compeer Financial, ACA (Unopposed) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wagner, Arielle)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 797 MOTION For an Order Permitting Production of Documents by Third Party Compeer Financial, ACA (Unopposed) filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Wagner, Arielle)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 10:00 AM CT by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer.Joint agenda due: July 7, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. CTIDR "moving party" letters due: July 8, 2021 by 5:00 p.m. CTIDR "responding party" letters due: July 13, 2021 by 12:00 p.m. CTUpdate letters due: July 13, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. CT Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/7/2021.(LNP)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #788 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Vanessa Anne Barsanti for Clemens Food Group, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/7/2021. (NAH)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 795 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Status Conference held on 6/4/2021. (ALM)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 ORDER APPROVING #791 Joint Stipulation of Consent for Leave to File Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint and DENYING AS MOOT #782 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/4/2021. (ALM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 792 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #791 Stipulation,,. (Finley, Alec)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 791 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of Consent for Leave to File Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiff Fourth Amended Class Action Complaint by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Clemens Food Group, LLC, The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Agri Stats, Inc., Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint - REDLINE, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Proposed Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint - CLEAN)(Finley, Alec)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 790 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Defendants' Update Letter re June 4, 2021 Status Conference. (Robison, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 789 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #782 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion For Leave to File Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Finley, Alec)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 788 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Vanessa Barsanti. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8795501 filed by Clemens Food Group, LLC. (McGhee, Davida)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 787 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Update Letter. (Wagner, Arielle)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #782 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion For Leave to File Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 MEMORANDUM in Support re #782 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion For Leave to File Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint - Redline, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Proposed Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #3 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Finley, Alec)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #782 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #782 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion For Leave to File Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint : Date and time to be determined. (Finley, Alec)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings Motion For Leave to File Fourth Amended and Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Finley, Alec)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 781 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #779 Stipulation,,. (Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 780 SEALED Exhibits A and B to the Stipulation of Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint re #779 Stipulation,, by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) B)(Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 779 STIPULATION of Consent for Leave to File Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Smithfield Foods, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC and The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, Agri Stats, Inc., Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, and Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) C - Redacted, #2 Exhibit(s) D - Redacted)(Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 778 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #773 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 777 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #773 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Declaration of Eric Schachter in Support of #773 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 775 MEMORANDUM in Support re #773 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 774 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #773 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants : Date and time to be determined. (Scarlett, Shana)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 773 MOTION to Approve the Manner and Form of Class Notice Regarding Settlement with JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 772 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kyle G. Bates (Bates, Kyle)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 771 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Proposed Joint Agenda for Hearing and Case Management Conference on June 4, 2021. (Wagner, Arielle)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 770 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #769 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sophie Roz Sedaghat for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/13/2021. (NAH)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sophie Sedaghat. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8746881 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Melissa)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 768 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney of Jetta C. Sandin (Graham, David)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER granting #754 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/3/2021. (HMA)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 766 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #765 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Ruge for Clemens Food Group, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/29/2021. (NAH)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 765 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas M. Ruge. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8707041 filed by Clemens Food Group, LLC. (McGhee, Davida)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference reset for 6/4/2021 at 01:00 PM CT by Video Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer.Joint agenda due: May 26, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. CTIDR "moving party" letters due: May 27, 2021 by 5:00 p.m. CTIDR "responding party" letters due: June 2, 2021 by 12:00 p.m. CTUpdate letters due: June 2, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. CT Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/23/2021.(LNP)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 763 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' joint letter [ECF No. #762 ] reporting that they do not have any issues that require intervention by or discussion with the Court at this time, and proposing that the Case Management Conference scheduled for April 28, 2021, be canceled. The Court agrees. The April 28, 2021 Case Management Conference is CANCELED. The joint letter of the parties will serve as the parties' update required by the order setting that conference. The Court will schedule the next status conference for June 4, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. CT. A separate notice with due dates for submissions in advance of the conference will be issued. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/21/2021.(LNP)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 762 REPORT re #736 Order/Notice of Setting/Resetting Hearings/Deadlines,, Proposed Joint Agenda for Case Management Conference on April 28, 2021 by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Hormel Foods, LLC, JBS USA, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Robison, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER granting #753 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Husgen for Triumph Foods, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/19/2021. (NAH)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 760 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #754 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 759 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #758 Sealed Document(s) - #758 Sealed Exhibit B filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 758 SEALED EXHIBIT Sealed Exhibit B re #757 Declaration in Support, filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Raiter, Shawn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 757 Declaration of Shawn M. Raiter in Support of #754 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Raiter, Shawn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 756 MEMORANDUM in Support re #754 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Raiter, Shawn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #754 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS : Date and time to be determined. (Raiter, Shawn)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 754 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Between the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Raiter, Shawn)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 753 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason Husgen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8670608 filed by Triumph Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Non-Resident to Serve as Local Counsel)(Chapin, Aaron)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting #740 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the JBS Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/2/2021. (HMA)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 751 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #750 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Benjamin Ernest Shiftan for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 4/1/2021. (NAH)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 750 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin E. Shiftan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8652579 filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Weiner, Melissa)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 749 ORDER on #747 Stipulation to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/30/2021.(LNP)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 748 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #747 Stipulation,,. (Wagner, Arielle)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 747 STIPULATION to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Direct Action Plaintiffs Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. and Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Clemens Food Group, LLC and The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation and Hormel Foods, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, and Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and Agri Stats, Inc. (Wagner, Arielle)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 746 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C Bourne on behalf of Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Bourne, Joseph)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 745 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval #740 Motion for Approval of Settlement. (Scarlett, Shana)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 744 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #740 Motion for Approval of Settlement filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Scarlett, Shana)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Declaration of Shana E. Scarlett in Support of #740 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Settlement Agreement)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 742 MEMORANDUM in Support re #740 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Scarlett, Shana)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 741 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #740 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the JBS Defendants : Date and time to be determined. (Scarlett, Shana)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 740 MOTION for Approval of Settlement Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Between Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs and the JBS Defendants filed by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney re Christina L. Briesacher (Johnson, Mark)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 738 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. Defendants' Update Letter Regarding Discovery. (Robison, Brian)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 737 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs . (Wagner, Arielle)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 4/28/2021 at 01:00 PM CT by ZOOMGOV (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Joint agenda due: April 20, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. CTIDR "moving party" letters due: April 21, 2021 by 5:00 p.m. CTIDR "responding party" letters due: April 26, 2021 by 5:00 p.m. CTUpdate letters due: April 26, 2021, by 5:00 p.m. CT Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/17/2021.(LNP)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 735 Text-Only ORDER Canceling Case Management Conference. The Court has reviewed the parties' joint letter [ECF No. 733] reporting that they do not have any issues that require intervention by or discussion with the Court at this time, and proposing that the status conference scheduled for March 22, 2021, be canceled. The Court agrees. The March 22, 2021 status conference is CANCELED. The parties will file letters on or before March 18, 2021, briefly updating the Court on the following discovery issues: (1) Search methodology and use of TAR; (2) Structured data; (3) Defendants' calendar entries; (4) Puerto Rico's initial disclosures and discovery responses; and (5) Status of third-party document production. The Court will schedule the next status conference for April 28, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. CT. A separate notice with due dates for submissions in advance of the conference will be issued. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/16/2021. (ALM)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 734 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Joseph C. Bourne (Weiner, Melissa)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 733 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Proposed Joint Agenda for Hearing and Case Management Conference on March 22, 2021. (Wagner, Arielle)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 732 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 2/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (43 pages). Court Reporter: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and #Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5 and #Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings. Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 3/22/2021. Redaction Request due 4/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2021. (EDD)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 731 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Summerlin, Vollis)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 730 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #720 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katherine Riley for Longhorn's Steakhouse; granting #721 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sterling Starns for Longhorn's Steakhouse. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/12/2021. (NAH)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER on #727 Stipulation to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/10/2021.(LNP)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 728 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Stipulation to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data #727 Stipulation,,. (Scarlett, Shana)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 727 STIPULATION to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Clemens Food Group, LLC and The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation and Hormel Foods, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation and Hormel Foods, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Triumph Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Agri Stats, Inc., Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER granting #696 Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Tostrud Law Group, P.C.; Zimmerman Reed LLP; Barrett Law Group, P.A.; and Bozeman Law Firm, P.A. to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/5/2021. (ALM)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Declaration of Marcus Neil Bozeman in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Declaration of Alia M. Abdi in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Declaration of Sarah Sterling Starns in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 722 Declaration of Anthony Carter in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 721 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sarah Sterling Starns. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8573233 filed by Longhorn's Steakhouse. (Raiter, Shawn)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Katherine B. Riley. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8573216 filed by Longhorn's Steakhouse. (Raiter, Shawn)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER approving #708 Stipulation Amending Notice Documents Regarding the Class Action Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 3/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 C)(HMA)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 718 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #706 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Woodruff, Jon)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER on #713 Stipulation to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data. The deadline for the parties to reach agreement on production of structured data or seek relief from the Court shall be extended to and including 3/9/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 3/3/2021.(LNP)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 716 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #706 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Clark, Brian)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 715 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #706 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (JGK)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 714 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #713 Stipulation,,. (Wagner, Arielle)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 713 STIPULATION to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs, Direct Action Plaintiffs Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc. and Bi-Lo Holdings, LLC, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Clemens Food Group, LLC and The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation and Hormel Foods, LLC, Seaboard Foods LLC and Seaboard Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Triumph Foods, LLC, and Smithfield Foods, Inc.. (Wagner, Arielle)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 712 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #706 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Taylor, Jarod)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 711 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #706 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Hall, Isaac)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 710 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of #706 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Erin Drost. (Heeman, Donald)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 709 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #708 Stipulation. (Pouya, Bobby)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 708 STIPULATION Amending Notice Documents Regarding the Class Action Settlement Between Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs and Defendant JBS by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by JBS USA Food Company. (Pouya, Bobby)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 707 TEXT-ONLY ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT re #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee. The Court has reviewed the Motion to Appoint Tostrud Law Group, P.C.; Zimmerman Reed LLP; Barrett Law Group, P.A.; and Bozeman Law Firm, P.A. to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee [ECF No. 696] and supporting documents, filed by the Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs ("CIIPPs"). The Court asks the CIIPPs to supplement their motion by filing no later than March 4, 2021, one or more declarations that address the diversity of the proposed steering committee, including the extent to which attorneys who represent a diverse population will play a meaningful leadership role in the work of the steering committee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/25/2021. (ALM)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 706 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2021 re #673 Motion for Entry of a Set-Aside Order filed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs; ORAL ORDER denying without prejudice #673 Motion. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (ALM)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 705 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney (Cambronne, Karl)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 704 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Declaration of Marcus Bozeman in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Bozeman Law Firm, P.A. Firm Resume)(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Declaration of John W. Barrett in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Barrett Law Group, P.A. Firm Resume)(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 701 Declaration of David M. Cialkowski in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Zimmerman Reed LLP Firm Resume)(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 700 Declaration of Jon A. Tostrud in Support of #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Tostrud Law Group, P.C. Firm Resume)(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 699 MEMORANDUM in Support re #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 698 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #696 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs.(Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 697 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions : Date and time to be determined. (Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 696 MOTION to Appoint Counsel to Plaintiffs' Steering Committee in CIIPP Actions filed by Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Finley, Alec)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER on #693 Stipulation to Amend the Pretrial Scheduling Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/23/2021.(LNP)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 694 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #693 Stipulation,,. (Scarlett, Shana)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 693 STIPULATION to Amend the Scheduling Pretrial Order Regarding Deadline on Structured Data by Consumer Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. Jointly Signed by Clemens Food Group, LLC and The Clemens Family Corp., Hormel Foods Corp. and Hormel Foods, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC and Seabord Corp., Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Agri Stats, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc., and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, and Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs. (Scarlett, Shana)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER on #690 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/22/2021. (ALM)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 691 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #690 Stipulation,,. (Robison, Brian)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 690 STIPULATION Extending the Time for the Non-Settling Defendants to Send Final Customer Lists to the Settlement Administrator by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs, Clemens Food Group, LLC and The Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation and Hormel Foods, LLC, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., and Tyson Prepared Foods, and Agri Stats, Inc.. (Robison, Brian)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 689 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #673 MOTION Set-Aside Order filed by Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, Seaboard Foods, LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., The Clemens Family Corporation, Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Woodruff, Jon)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 688 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-FILED IN WRONG CASE. NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cheney Brothers, Inc. (Moss, Carol) Modified text on 2/12/2021 (lmb).
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER granting #670 Motion for Permission for Non-Resident Attorney to Serve as Local Counsel and Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tessa K Jacob for Triumph Foods, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 2/10/2021. (NAH)