Collier v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kathryn Collier
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc., Bayer AG, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Corporation and Bayer Pharma AG
Case Number: 0:2018cv01897
Filed: July 10, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Fluoroquinolone Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2642 (JRT). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2642-JRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Fluoroquinolone MDL website at: # http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Fluoroquinolone/index.shtml. (lmb)
July 10, 2018 10 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/25/2016. (lmb)
July 10, 2018 9 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02617. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL List.
July 9, 2018 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the District of Minnesota. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
June 6, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kathryn Collier.. (Sims, Thomas) (Filed on 6/6/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
June 5, 2018 6 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCKET NO #7 *** CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kathryn Collier.. (Sims, Thomas) (Filed on 6/5/2018) Modified on 6/6/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
May 22, 2018 5 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/5/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
May 7, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Merck & Co, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
May 4, 2018 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
May 4, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/18/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]
May 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12324233.). Filed byKathryn Collier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Bayer Corp, #3 Summons Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, #4 Summons Merck)(Sims, Thomas) (Filed on 5/3/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 7/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collier v. Bayer HealthCare Pharmaceuticals Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Collier
Represented By: Thomas M Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Pharma AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?