International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10 v. A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10
Defendant: A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv01960
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2018. Discovery due by 4/30/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 5/31/2019. Motions (disp) due by 6/30/2019. Ready for trial due by 9/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/7/2018. (VLM)
September 5, 2018 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/5/2018. (VLM)
August 31, 2018 Filing 19 STATEMENT OF CASE as to A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.. (Roby, Joseph)
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10 . (Cummins, Justin) Document restrict to counsel of record per instructions from Magistrate Judge Brisbois' chambers. Modified access and text on 8/31/2018 (JLB).
August 28, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.. Jointly Signed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Local Union No. 10.(Roby, Joseph)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/24/2018. (VLM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation,. (Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME TO RESPOND by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10. Jointly Signed by A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc., d/b/a A-1 Refrigeration Heating and Air Conditioning, Inc.. (Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Partial Dismissal of the Counterclaim Complaint #8 Motion to Dismiss/General,. (Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10.(Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Michael McCauley in SUPPORT OF #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General OF THE COUNTER CLAIM COMPLAINT filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-2, #2 Exhibit(s) 3, #3 Exhibit(s) 4-6)(Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General OF THE COUNTER CLAIM COMPLAINT filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #8 MOTION to Dismiss/General OF THE COUNTER CLAIM COMPLAINT : Date and time to be determined. (Cummins, Justin)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/General OF THE COUNTER CLAIM COMPLAINT filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10. (Cummins, Justin)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(VLM)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc., Counter Claimant A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.. (Roby, Joseph)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10. filed by A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.. (Roby, Joseph)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Amended Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint,,. (Cummins, Justin)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc. (MMG)
July 13, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-1960 JRT/LIB. (MMG)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6225186) filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C, #2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//WILL BE RE-FILED//Civil Cover Sheet) (Cummins, Justin) Modified text on 7/13/2018 (JDF). Modified text on 7/13/2018 (MMG). Modified text on 7/13/2018 (JDF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10 v. A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail, and Transportation Local Union No. 10
Represented By: Justin D Cummins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Refrigeration of Hibbing, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Waldie
Represented By: Joseph John Roby, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?