Boitnott v. Slumberland Franchising, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: Larson Enterprises and Slumberland Franchising, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02037
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: Ramsey
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The Court has been advised that this matter has settled; therefore the September 17, 2018 pretrial conference is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/10/2018. (KMH)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jerald Boitnott . (Michenfelder, Patrick)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (KMH)
August 8, 2018 Filing 8 Joint ANSWER to Complaint filed by Larson Enterprises, Slumberland Franchising, Inc.. (Merz, Gregory)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Defendants Slumberland Franchising, Inc. d/b/a Slumberland Furniture and Larson Enterprises shall have to and including August 8, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff Jerald Boitnott. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/25/2018. (KMH)
July 24, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Sicoli, Amanda)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Larson Enterprises, Slumberland Franchising, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Jerald Boitnott. (Sicoli, Amanda)
July 20, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Chad A. Throndset as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights - Housing/Accomodations & ADA list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-2037 DWF/DTS. (kt)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Larson Enterprises, Slumberland Franchising, Inc.. (Sicoli, Amanda)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County District Court, case number To Be Assigned (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6236697) filed by Larson Enterprises, Slumberland Franchising, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Sicoli, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. Slumberland Franchising, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larson Enterprises
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slumberland Franchising, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Sicoli
Represented By: Gregory R Merz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?