Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A. and Kathy D. Ryan
Case Number: 0:2018cv02209
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. Kathy D. Ryan served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. (Hedlund, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A. served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Hedlund, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Defend. The time for Defendants Kathy D. Ryan, in her capacity as Trustee of The Brody Family Trust, and Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A. to plead, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall extended to and including September 28, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/22/2018. (JMK)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A. re #10 Proposed Order to Judge, #9 Stipulation (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Defend by Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America and Kathy D. Ryan. (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A. re #7 Notice of Appearance of Kristina Kaluza (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Kaluza on behalf of Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
July 31, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Allianz of America, Inc. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. Allianz Europe B.V. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. Allianz SE is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hedlund, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A., Kathy D. Ryan. (kt)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2209 WMW/HB. (kt)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Kathy D. Ryan, in her capacity as Trustee of The Brody Family Trust, and Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A.. (Hedlund, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against Kathy D. Ryan, in her capacity as Trustee of The Brody Family Trust, and Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6261392) filed by Allianze Life Insurance Company of North America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hedlund, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Isaac B Hall
Represented By: Jeffrey D Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Forest Bank & Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy D. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?