United States of America v. $27,740 in U.S. Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $27,740 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 0:2018cv02216
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION of SETTLEMENT by United States of America. Jointly Signed by Ken Mark. (Tweeten, Andrew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of of PUBLICATION by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Tweeten, Andrew)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling September 26, 2018 Pretrial Conference. The parties have advised the Court that the above matter has been resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/18/2018. (KMH)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David M. Michael for $27,740 in U.S. Currency. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/20/2018. (JGK)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (KMH)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM Verified Claim of Ken Mark Opposing Forfeiture filed by $27,740 in U.S. Currency. (Grimshaw, Steven)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Michael. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6310743 filed by $27,740 in U.S. Currency. (Grimshaw, Steven)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/10/2018. (CLB)
July 31, 2018 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-2216 (DSD/DTS). (lmb)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $27,740 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tweeten, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $27,740 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $27,740 in U.S. Currency
Represented By: David M. Michael
Represented By: Steven T Grimshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew Tweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?