List et al v. Carwell et al
Plaintiff: Alicia List and Jason List
Defendant: Robert Carwell, 0820527BCLTD d/b/a Let It Ride Carriers and 0820527 B C LTD
Case Number: 0:2018cv02253
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/15/2018. (CLB)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to 0820527 B C LTD, Robert Carwell. (AKL)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18cv2253 DSD/TNL. (AKL)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Defendants 0820527BCLTD d/b/a Let It Ride Carriers, Robert Carwell. (Halbach, Alex)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 0820527BCLTD d/b/a Let It Ride Carriers, Robert Carwell (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6267945) filed by Jason List, Alicia List. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Halbach, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: List et al v. Carwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia List
Represented By: Alex Steven Halbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason List
Represented By: Alex Steven Halbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0820527BCLTD d/b/a Let It Ride Carriers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0820527 B C LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?