Segal v. Metropolitan Council

Plaintiff: Barry R. Segal and Barry Segal
Defendant: Metropolitan Council
Case Number: 0:2018cv02333
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Hennepin
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Metropolitan Council. (Ellingstad, Susan)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on #9 Stipulation to Enlarge Defendant's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond: The time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended until and including September 14, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/29/2018. (JMK)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Ellingstad, Susan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Metropolitan Council. Jointly Signed by Barry Segal. (Ellingstad, Susan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Matthew Owen on behalf of Metropolitan Council. (Owen, Stephen)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan E Ellingstad on behalf of Metropolitan Council. (Ellingstad, Susan)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/15/2018. (CLB)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barry Segal. Metropolitan Council served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Macpherson, Roderick)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Council. (AKL)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18cv2333 DSD/HB. (AKL)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Council (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6295031) filed by Barry R. Segal. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Macpherson, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segal v. Metropolitan Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Council
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Owen
Represented By: Susan E Ellingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry R. Segal
Represented By: Roderick J Macpherson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Segal
Represented By: Roderick J Macpherson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?