Normark Corporation v. Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc.

Plaintiff: Normark Corporation
Defendant: Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02335
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Aitkin
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Normark Corporation (Bjorklund, Shannon)
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Eric C. Tostrud, this case is reassigned to him. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2335 ECT/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (ACH)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason Alan Pittman for Normark Corporation.; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tim F Williams for Normark Corporation. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/14/2018. (JGK)
August 13, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (TJB)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tim F. Williams. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6297246 filed by Normark Corporation. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason A. Pittman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6297190 filed by Normark Corporation. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Tim F. Williams, Jason A. Pittman as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc.. (AKL)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18cv2335 WMW/SER. (AKL)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rapala VMC Corporation is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Normark Corporation. (Bjorklund, Shannon)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6295308) filed by Normark Corporation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bjorklund, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Normark Corporation v. Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z-Man Fishing Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Normark Corporation
Represented By: Shannon L Bjorklund
Represented By: Jason Alan Pittman
Represented By: Tim F Williams
Represented By: Kenneth E Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?