Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation v. Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation
Defendant: Fraser Cooke, Addiction Enders and Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02374
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
County: Chisago
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 19 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2374 (JNE/ECW). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Theresa Anderson, at 651-848-1890, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (lmb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC.(Winkels, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #12 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC.(Winkels, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 16 Declaration of Eric Mitchell in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC.(Winkels, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 15 Declaration of Megan M. New in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Winkels, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Winkels, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #12 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Winkels, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (Winkels, Joseph)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Megan New for Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC.; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Phillip Hill for Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/26/2018. (JGK)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phillip A. L. Hill. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6394497 filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (Winkels, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Megan M. New. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6394480 filed by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (Winkels, Joseph)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Defendant Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC has until September 27, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 9/5/2018. (KAT)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Winkels, Joseph)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. Jointly Signed by Plaintiff Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. (Winkels, Joseph)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W Winkels on behalf of Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (Winkels, Joseph)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Chambers, Tucker)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Addiction Enders, Fraser Cooke, Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC. (kt)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18-cv-2374 JNE/KMM. (kt)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Addiction Enders, Fraser Cookes, Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC d/b/a Addiction Campuses (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6303927) filed by Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-O, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Chambers, Tucker)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation v. Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazelden Betty Ford Foundation
Represented By: Tucker A. Chambers
Represented By: Gerald H Fornwald
Represented By: Bradley J Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addiction Enders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Healthcare of America, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Winkels
Represented By: Megan New
Represented By: Phillip Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?