Makarova v.PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The

Plaintiff: Iana Makarova
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Case Number: 0:2018cv02413
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
2 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 10/4/2018. (RMM)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Berens, Barbara)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Stipulation of Dismissal of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Jointly Signed by Iana Makarova and The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Berens, Barbara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Eric C. Tostrud, this case is reassigned to him. Judge Susan Richard Nelson is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18cv2413 ECT/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Iana Makarova. (Bauer, Blake)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. filed by Iana Makarova. No summons requested. (Bauer, Blake)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (AKL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18cv2413 SRN/DTS. (AKL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6313397) filed by Iana Makarova. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bauer, Blake)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makarova v.PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Erin K Fogarty Lisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Represented By: Barbara P Berens
Represented By: Erin K Fogarty Lisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iana Makarova
Represented By: Blake R Bauer
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?