Kukic v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Hava Kukic
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 0:2018cv02414
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Tony N Leung
1 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 10 Featured Case NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 12, 2018 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a), Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America states as follows: Life Insurance Company of North America is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Connecticut General Corporation, which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CIGNA Holdings, Inc., which is a wholly-owned subsidiary of CIGNA Corporation. CIGNA Corporation is publicly traded.(Eidsness, Kyle) Modified text on 10/15/2018 (MMP).
October 12, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Eidsness, Kyle)
August 28, 2018 7 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for Life Insurance Company of North America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/28/2018. (JGK)
August 27, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. (Santos, Margaret)
August 27, 2018 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6333797 filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
August 27, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America. (Santos, Margaret)
August 17, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (MMP)
August 17, 2018 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-2414 (PJS/TNL). (MMP)
August 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6313553) filed by Hava Kukic. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Klotzbuecher, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kukic v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hava Kukic
Represented By: Mark Klotzbuecher
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Kyle Alan Eidsness
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?