Burnette v. Howmedica Osteonics et al

Plaintiff: Lynor Burnette
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation, Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp. and Stryker Ireland Limited
Case Number: 0:2018cv02415
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: Minnesota District Court
Office: DMN Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Donovan W Frank
1 Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2018 7 NOTICE by Lynor Burnette Notice of Revision Surgery (Bowersox, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynor Burnette. Howmedica Osteonics served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Stryker Corp. served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018; Stryker Sales Corporation served on 8/20/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Addendum, #2 Addendum)(Bowersox, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lynor Burnette. Stryker Ireland Limited served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Nemo, Anthony)
August 17, 2018 4 (Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Stryker Rejuvenate and ABG II Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, 0:13-md-02441-DWF-BRT. Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:13-md-2441-DWF-BRT. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Stryker Rejuvenate MDL website at: #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Stryker/index. (AKL)
August 17, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Howmedica Osteonics, Stryker Corp., Stryker Ireland Limited, Stryker Sales Corporation. (AKL)
August 17, 2018 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18cv2415 DWF/BRT. (AKL)
August 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6313578) filed by Lynor Burnette. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowersox, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnette v. Howmedica Osteonics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Ireland Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynor Burnette
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Bowersox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?