Nelson v. AEON Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Warren F. Nelson
Defendant: Shanon Ployhart, Colin Burkholder, EPG Security Group, Defendant C (Name unknown), AEON Property Management, et al., Defendant B (last name unknown), Crane Ordway Limited Partnership, Defendant A, (last name unknown), AEON Management, LLC, Kelly Hawkinson, Scott Redd, Corinna Lowe, Marsha Lidgerding and Jamal Abdirahman
Case Number: 0:2018cv02436
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
0 Judge: Steven E Rau
1 Judge: John R Tunheim
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #5 Supplement: Rescanned exhibits to make photos more legible. (KMH)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18cv2436 JRT/ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Theresa Anderson, at 651-848-1890, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. cc: plaintiff (JME)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 AMENDMENT AND SUPPLEMENT PLEADING TO #1 Complaint, filed by Warren F. Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-34)(lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2018: #2 Rescanned Exhibits) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 10/16/18 (KMH)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Warren F. Nelson.(kt) Qc'd on 9/20/2018 (AKL).
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Warren F. Nelson. (kt) Qc'd on 9/20/2018 (AKL).
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Warren F. Nelson. (kt) Qc'd on 9/20/2018 (AKL).
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AEON Management, LLC, AEON Property Management, et al., Jamal Abdirahman, Colin Burkholder, Crane Ordway Limited Partnership, Defendant A, (last name unknown), Defendant B (last name unknown), Defendant C (Name unknown), EPG Security Group, Kelly Hawkinson, Marsha Lidgerding, Corinna Lowe, Shanon Ployhart, Scott Redd filed by Warren F. Nelson. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil Rights Housing/Accomodations list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. CC: Nelson. (kt) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-31, #2 Exhibits 32-Supplemental Exhibit 25, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt) Qc'd on 9/20/2018 (AKL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. AEON Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shanon Ployhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Burkholder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPG Security Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant C (Name unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEON Property Management, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant B (last name unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Ordway Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant A, (last name unknown)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEON Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hawkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corinna Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Lidgerding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamal Abdirahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren F. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?