Smith v. Griffeth

Plaintiff: Eric Smith
Defendant: Scott Griffeth
Case Number: 0:2018cv02462
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
2 Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the appointment of Judge Nancy E. Brasel, this case is reassigned to her. Judge Joan N. Ericksen is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2462 NEB/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (LJG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eric Smith filed by Eric Smith, #1 Complaint, filed by Eric Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/18/2018. (VLM) cc: Eric Smith. Modified text on 9/19/2018 (MMP).
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Eric Smith. (AKL)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support of Hearing filed by Eric Smith. (Attachments: #1Order from North Dakota, #2 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd on 10/12/2018 (JGK).
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Eric Smith re #1 Complaint byEric Smith. (kt) Document QC'd on 10/12/2018 (JGK).
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Eric Smith. (kt) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (kt). Document QC'd on 10/12/2018 (JGK).
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Griffeth filed by Eric Smith. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Sixth Division Civil Rights/Housing/Accomodations & ADA (Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (kt) cc: Smith. (kt) Document QC'd on 10/12/2018 (JGK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Griffeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Griffeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?