Hee v. Hadaway et al
Plaintiff: Albert S.N. Hee
Defendant: Dr. Sheila Hadaway, Dr. Lon Krieg and Dr. Assefa Ayalew
Case Number: 0:2018cv02466
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
2 Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright, this case is reassigned to her. Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-02466-DSD-ECW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Please contact Theresa Anderson, at 651-848-1890, for scheduling or other matters related to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (JAT) cc: Albert S.N. Hee. Modified text on 9/19/2018 (MMP).
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE/Entry of Order issued by the Honorable William T. Lawrence, Judge for the Southern District of Indiana. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00301. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty and referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson per 3rd/4th Prisoner List. cc: Albert Hee. (kt)
July 10, 2018 Filing 5 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the USDC of Minnesota. Case transferred electronically to USDC of Minnesota at Winona, Minnesota, on July 9, 2018. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/23/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLOSED TRANSFER - Order Transferring Action to First Division of Minnesota: Based on the foregoing, and without having directed the plaintiff to pay the filing fee for this action or demonstrate his inability to do so, the above action is now TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the First District of Minnesota at Winona, Minnesota (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/9/2018. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/23/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/23/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ASSEFA AYALEW, SHEILA HADAWAY, LON KRIEG, filed by ALBERT S.N. HEE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/23/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 1 ENTRY - To effectuate this ruling, two new civil actions from the Terre Haute Division shall be opened, consistent with the following: a. Albert S.N. Hee shall be the plaintiff in each of the newly opened actions. b. The Nature of Suit in each of the newly opened actions shall be 555. c. The Cause of Action in the first of the newly opened actions shall be 28:1331b. d. The Cause of Action in the second of the newly opened actions shall be 28:1346t. e. The complaint in this action shall be filed and re-docketed as the complaint in each of the newly opened actions. f. A copy of this Entry shall be docketed in each of the newly opened actions. with this actionand with each other as linked actions. g. This action and each of the newly-opened actions shall be shown with this actionand with each other as linked actions. h. The defendants in the first of the newly opened actions shall be Dr. SheilaHadaway, Dr. Lon Krieg, and Dr. Assefa Ayalew. i. The defendant in the second of the newly opened actions shall be the United States of America. j. The assignment of judicial officers shall be by random draw. Claims in the newly-opened actions are distinct from those in this action and from each other (SEE ENTRY). Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 7/2/2018. ***DOCKETED FOR ADMINISTRATIVE PURPOSES*** (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/23/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hee v. Hadaway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Sheila Hadaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lon Krieg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Assefa Ayalew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert S.N. Hee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?