Epee v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Leopold B. Epee
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 0:2018cv02520
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2018 at 01:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Brooker, Gregory)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Leopold B. Epee re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Epee, Leopold)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Leopold B. Epee re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Epee, Leopold)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory G Brooker on behalf of United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Brooker, Gregory)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (MMG)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-2520 PAM/TNL. (MMG)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6337659) filed by Leopold B. Epee. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Epee, Leopold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epee v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Gregory G Brooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopold B. Epee
Represented By: Leopold B Epee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?