Granite Re, Inc. v. Blue Earth County
Plaintiff: Granite Re, Inc.
Defendant: Blue Earth County
Case Number: 0:2018cv02561
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 6/14/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/10/2019. Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/26/2018. (MSK)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 8/2/2019. Motions (disp) due by 10/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/26/2018. (MSK)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2018. (MSK)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Granite Re, Inc. Jointly signed by Blue Earth County. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 10/19/2018 (kt).
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Granite Re, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gregerson, Daniel)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing, TIME CHANGE ONLY: The Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 will begin at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Granite Re, Inc.. filed by Blue Earth County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Justin, Roger)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Granite Re, Inc. of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Gregerson, Daniel)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Blue Earth County. (kt)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2561 PJS/BRT. (kt)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Granite Re, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6346623) filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nilan, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 9/4/2018 (AKL).
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Blue Earth County in Civil Action Granite Re, Inc.. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 9/4/2018 (AKL).
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Federated Mutual Insurance Co is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Granite Re, Inc.. (Nilan, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Blue Earth County filed by Granite Re, Inc. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 8/31/2018 (KNK). Modified on 9/4/2018 (AKL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite Re, Inc. v. Blue Earth County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite Re, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph A Nilan
Represented By: Daniel R Gregerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Earth County
Represented By: Roger C Justin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?