Milbank Insurance Company v. Gree USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Milbank Insurance Company as subrogee of Ilya Soroka and Milbank Insurance Company
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02580
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/NOTICE of Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 10/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (LPH)
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Christopher A. O'Brien as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant GREE USA, INC., is a non governmental corporate party and Gree Electrical Appliance, Inc., of Zhuhai owns 51% and MJC America d/b/a Soleus International owns 49% of Defendant (Fredrickson, Mark) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (MMP).
October 9, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with attached Certificate of Service filed by Gree USA, Inc. (Fredrickson, Mark) Modified text on 10/10/2018 (MMP).
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milbank Insurance Company. Gree USA, Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Crema, Peter)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/7/2018. (CLB)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Marisa L Saber for Milbank Insurance Company. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 9/5/2018. (JGK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marisa L. Saber. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6351109 filed by Milbank Insurance Company. (Crema, Peter)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Milbank Insurance Company. State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiff Milbank Insurance Company. (Crema, Peter)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gree USA, Inc.. (KNK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Marisa L. Saber as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (KNK)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-2580 (DSD/DTS). (KNK)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gree USA, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6348635) filed by Milbank Insurance Company as subrogee of Ilya Soroka. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crema, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milbank Insurance Company v. Gree USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milbank Insurance Company as subrogee of Ilya Soroka
Represented By: Peter L Crema, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: Marisa L Saber
Represented By: Peter L Crema, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?