Davis et al v. Mack et al
Plaintiff: James L Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan and James L. Davis
Defendant: Jeffrey Mack and Lawrence Blaney
Case Number: 0:2018cv02581
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Plaintiffs (Pull, Joseph)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/23/2018. (TMA)
October 5, 2018 Filing 20 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Lawrence Blaney . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Steinlage, Michael)
October 3, 2018 Filing 19 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by James L. Davis . (Pull, Joseph)
October 1, 2018 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2018 re #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan, James L. Davis. (TMA)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Stipulation.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/25/2018. (TMA)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Steinlage, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION by Lawrence Blaney. Signed by Lawrence Blaney only. (Steinlage, Michael) Modified on 9/25/2018 (kt).
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Michael J. Steinlage in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Lawrence Blaney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10, #11 Exhibit(s) 11, #12 Exhibit(s) 12, #13 Exhibit(s) 13)(Steinlage, Michael)
September 21, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by Lawrence Blaney. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Steinlage, Michael)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders,, filed by James L. Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan.(Pull, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by James L. Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan.(Pull, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Declaration of Joseph Pull in Support of #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by James L. Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3)(Pull, Joseph)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders : Hearing set for 10/1/18 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3C, St. Paul, before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth C. Wright. (Pull, Joseph) Modified on 9/24/2018 (kt).
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by James L. Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Pull, Joseph)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Joseph Pull by James L. Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan . (Pull, Joseph)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Correct Other Orders filed by James L. Davis, Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan. (Attachments: #1 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Supplement Memorandom of Law in Support of Motion to Amend Complaint, #2 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Supplement Notice of Hearing on Motion to Amend Complaint, #3 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Supplement Declaration of Joseph Pull, #4 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Joseph Pull, #5 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Joseph Pull, #6 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Joseph Pull, #7 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Supplement Meet and Confer Statement, #8 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Supplement Proposed Order, #9 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED Supplement Certificate of Compliance)(Pull, Joseph) Modified on 9/21/2018 (kt).
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Lawrence Blaney to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to September 25, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/12/2018. (TMA)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Steinlage, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lawrence Blaney. Jointly Signed by James L. Davis and Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan. (Steinlage, Michael)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth C. Wright. Please use case number 18-cv-2581 (PJS/ECW). (KNK)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-cv-18-12728 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6349444) filed by Lawrence Blaney. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Consent Form, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Steinlage, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Mack et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Blaney
Represented By: Michael J Steinlage
Represented By: Kelly A Lelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis and Associates, Inc. 401K Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Mark J Briol
Represented By: F Chet Taylor
Represented By: Joseph Alan Pull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Davis
Represented By: Mark J Briol
Represented By: F Chet Taylor
Represented By: Joseph Alan Pull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?