Pueschner v. Life Care Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gordon Pueschner
Defendant: Life Care Services, LLC, CRSA/LCS Management, LLC and Waterford Manor Operations, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv02611
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SEALED AMENDED ORDER/NOTICE to Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/11/2018. (MSK)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEALED ORDER/NOTICE to Attorney. Sealed Order Directing the Distribution of Wrongful Death Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/3/2018. (MSK)
October 2, 2018 Filing 19 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #18 [Proposed] Order. (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 SEALED PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Distribution of Wrongful Death Settlement #9 Sealed Document by Gordon Pueschner. (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 EXHIBIT Consent to Distribution and Waiver of Hearing of Kerry Rademacher re #9 Sealed Document. (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #15 Sealed Exhibit 3 . (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 SEALED EXHIBIT 3 re #9 Sealed Document by Gordon Pueschner. (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #13 Sealed Exhibit 2 . (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 SEALED EXHIBIT 2 re #9 Sealed Document by Gordon Pueschner. (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #11 Sealed Exhibit 1 . (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 re #9 Sealed Document by Gordon Pueschner. (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #9 Petition and Application for Distribution of Wrongful Death Settmenet . (Gross, Andrew)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 SEALED Petition and Application for Distribution of Wrongful Death Settmenet by Gordon Pueschner. (Gross, Andrew)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE to Attorney. Order granting leave to file Confidential Settlement Documents as Confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/24/2018. (MSK)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR: REFILED. (Text-only) ORDER on #5 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/24/2018. (MSK) Modified on 9/24/2018 (kt).
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Gross, Andrew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION Granting Leave to File Confidential Settlement Documents as Confidential by Gordon Pueschner. Jointly Signed by Life Care Services, LLC, CRSA/LCS Management, LLC, and Waterford Manor Operations, LLC. (Gross, Andrew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gordon Pueschner . (Gross, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CRSA/LCS Management, LLC, Life Care Services, LLC, Waterford Manor Operations, LLC. (MMG)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2611 PJS/BRT. (MMG)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CRSA/LCS Management, LLC, Life Care Services, LLC, Waterford Manor Operations, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6354221) filed by Gordon Pueschner, Trustee for the Next of Kin of Gay Pueschner, Deceased. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gross, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pueschner v. Life Care Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Care Services, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas H Jakobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRSA/LCS Management, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas H Jakobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waterford Manor Operations, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas H Jakobe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Pueschner
Represented By: Andrew D Gross
Represented By: Mark R Kosieradzki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?