U.S. Bank National Association v. M&T Bank
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: M&T Bank
Case Number: 0:2018cv02628
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Text-only) ORDER on #11 Stipulation. Pursuant to the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. 11), entered into by the parties, seeking an extension of time for Defendant to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stipulation (ECF No. 11) is ADOPTED and that Defendant shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF No. 1) in this matter on or before November 28, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/8/2018. (MME)
November 7, 2018 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 Stipulation. (Rowell, Kristin)
November 7, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint - Second by M&T Bank. Jointly Signed by US Bank National Association. (Rowell, Kristin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter McElligott on behalf of M&T Bank. (McElligott, Peter)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-only) ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Defendant shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF No. 1) in this matter on or before 11/8/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 10/9/2018. (MME)
October 8, 2018 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Rowell, Kristin)
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by M&T Bank. Jointly Signed by US Bank National Association. (Rowell, Kristin)
October 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin B Rowell on behalf of M&T Bank. (Rowell, Kristin)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by U.S. Bank National Association re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Hofman, Kevin)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to M&T Bank. (MMP)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd, 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-2628 (PJS/SER). (MMP)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civl Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (Hofman, Kevin)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M&T Bank (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6357966) filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Hofman, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. M&T Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Kevin D Hofman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank
Represented By: Peter McElligott
Represented By: Kristin B Rowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?