Lai v. Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.
Plaintiff: John Lai
Defendant: Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02691
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2018. Discovery due by 1/25/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2018. Motions (non-disp) due 2/15/2019. Motions (disp) due by 4/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 11/7/2018. (MSK)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order of Reference based on Consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2691 (BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/5/2018. (MMP)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - REFILED - ORDER OF REFERENCE based on Consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2691 (BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 11/5/2018. (MMP) Modified text on 11/6/2018 (MMP).
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 Joint Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge with appeal to 8th Circuit. (Orenstein, John)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas J. Fleming for Gemini Master Fund, Ltd. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/24/2018. (JGK)
October 22, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/22/2018. (MSK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT Joint, Rule 26(f) by Gemini Master Fund, Ltd. Jointly signed by Plaintiff. (Orenstein, John) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (kt).
October 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas J. Fleming. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6438293 filed by Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.. (Orenstein, John)
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM filed by John Lai. (Knutson, Robert) Modified on 10/17/2018 (kt).
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.. (Orenstein, John)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing: The pretrial conference, originally set for 10/24/2018, is reset to 10/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Securities & Antitrust list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2691 SRN/BRT. (MMG)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Gemini Master Fund, Ltd. ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM Gemini Special Opportunities Fund, L.P., as successor to Gemini Master Fund, Ltd. against John Lai. filed by Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.. (Orenstein, John)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal. (Orenstein, John) Modified text on 9/24/2018 (lmb).
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, case number None (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6374885) filed by Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint) (Orenstein, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lai v. Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gemini Master Fund, Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas J. Fleming
Represented By: John B Orenstein
Represented By: Harry N Niska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lai
Represented By: Robert O Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?