Smith v. Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company

Plaintiff: Scott Smith
Defendant: Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 0:2018cv02707
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company. (Duncan, Gregory)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company. (Duncan, Gregory)
September 24, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Donovan W. Frank's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these practice pointers, in addition to the District of Minnesota's Local Rules and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (las)
September 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company. (lmb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-cv-2707 (DWF/TNL). (lmb)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6380592) filed by Scott Smith. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Browne, Padraigin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Smith
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bierman Group, Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Gregory J Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?