City of Cambridge v. One Love Housing, LLC

Plaintiff: City of Cambridge
Defendant: One Love Housing, LLC
Counter Claimant: Nate Pearson and Thomas Bergoff
Case Number: 0:2018cv02763
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Marek on behalf of City of Cambridge. (Marek, Joseph)
November 16, 2018 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by City of Cambridge. Jointly Signed by City of Cambridge (pl), One Love Housing (df), One Love Housing (cp), Thomas Bergoff (cp), Nate Pearson (cp), and City of Cambridge (cd).(Schwie, Jessica)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by One Love Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Local Rule 7.1(f) and 7.1(h) Certificate of Compliance)(Benson, Scott)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/20/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (JMK)
October 25, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by City of Cambridge. (Schwie, Jessica)
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Cambridge re #15 Proposed Order to Judge , CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by City of Cambridge re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Vieira, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Cambridge.(Vieira, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by City of Cambridge.(Vieira, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Vieira, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Cambridge. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Vieira, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Cambridge. (Vieira, Elizabeth)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E Schwie on behalf of City of Cambridge. (Schwie, Jessica)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven G Polin for One Love Housing, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/12/2018. (JGK)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven G. Polin. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6420874 filed by One Love Housing, LLC. (Hoffner, Fabian)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against City of Cambridge. filed by One Love Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-5) (Benson, Scott)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Steven G. Polin as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2763 (NEB/HB). (lmb)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT WITH ATTACHED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant One Love Housing, LLC. (Benson, Scott) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (MMP).
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tenth Judicial District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6397309) filed by One Love Housing, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Benson, Scott) Modified text on 10/2/2018 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Cambridge v. One Love Housing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Cambridge
Represented By: Jay T Squires
Represented By: Elizabeth J Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Love Housing, LLC
Represented By: Scott A Benson
Represented By: Steven G Polin
Represented By: Fabian S Hoffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Nate Pearson
Represented By: Scott A Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Thomas Bergoff
Represented By: Scott A Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?