McCourt v. City of Chanhassen

Plaintiff: Noah John McCourt
Defendant: Chanhassen, City of and City of Chanhassen
Case Number: 0:2018cv02771
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Chanhassen. (kt)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to City of Chanhassen. (AKL)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/25/2018. (TMA) cc: Attorney Padraigin Browne with one USM-285 form. Modified on 10/26/2018 (lmb).
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Noah John McCourt. (Browne, Padraigin)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Noah John McCourt. (AKL) QC'd on 11/1/2018 (lmb).
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Chanhassen, filed by Noah John McCourt. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (cc: McCourt) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (AKL) QC'd on 11/1/2018 (lmb). Modified text on 11/7/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCourt v. City of Chanhassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanhassen, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chanhassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah John McCourt
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?