McCourt v. Carver County

Plaintiff: Noah J. McCourt
Defendant: Carver County
Case Number: 0:2018cv02772
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk's Office re USM Form. (cc: Pl Counsel with USM form) (AKL)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/25/2018. (JMK)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann R Goering on behalf of Carver County. (Goering, Ann)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 10/18/2018. (CLB)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Noah J. McCourt. (Browne, Padraigin)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK) cc: Noah J. McCourt. Modified on 10/10/2018 (lmb).
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Noah J. McCourt. (kt) QC'd on 11/1/2018 (lmb).
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carver County filed by Noah J. McCourt. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights/Housing/Accomodations list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kt)cc: Noah J. McCourt. (kt) QC'd on 11/1/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCourt v. Carver County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver County
Represented By: Timothy A Sullivan
Represented By: Ann R Goering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah J. McCourt
Represented By: Padraigin Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?