Pemberton v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Sally Pemberton
Defendant: John D. Buck, Sarena S. Lin, Tim Rogan, Scott P. Anderson, Ann B. Gugino, Mark S Walchirk, Jody H. Feragen, Neal A. Schrimsher, David Misiak, Patterson Companies, Inc., Alex N. Blanco, James W Wiltz, Paul Guggenheim, Ellen A Rudnick, Les C. Vinney, Mark S. Walchirk and James W. Wiltz
Case Number: 0:2018cv02818
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy W Brown for Sally Pemberton. Approved by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/14/2018. (JGK)
November 12, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy W. Brown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6489302 filed by Sally Pemberton. (Czuchry, Mark)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER on #14 Stipulation Regarding Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. The time for Defendants and Nominal Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to and including December 21, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/17/2018. (JMK)
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Stipulation,. (Thomas, Aaron)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint by Scott P. Anderson, Alex N. Blanco, John D. Buck, Jody H. Feragen, Paul Guggenheim, Ann B. Gugino, Sarena S. Lin, David Misiak, Patterson Companies, Inc., Tim Rogan, Ellen A Rudnick, Neal A. Schrimsher, Les C. Vinney, Mark S. Walchirk, James W. Wiltz. Jointly Signed by Sally Pemberton. (Thomas, Aaron)
October 16, 2018 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Patterson Companies, Inc.. (Thomas, Aaron)
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick S Williams on behalf of All Defendants. (Williams, Patrick)
October 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Weber on behalf of All Defendants. (Weber, Jordan)
October 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron G Thomas on behalf of All Defendants. (Thomas, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sally Pemberton. Patterson Companies, Inc. served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Czuchry, Mark)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy W. Brown. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6409168 filed by Sally Pemberton. (Czuchry, Mark) Modified on 10/17/2018 (JGK).
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Phillip Kim and Timothy W. Brown as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Paul Guggenheim, David Misiak, Patterson Companies, Inc., Tim Rogan, James W. Wiltz. (MMP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Scott P. Anderson, Alex N. Blanco, John D. Buck, Jody H. Feragen, Ann B. Gugino, Sarena S. Lin, Ellen A Rudnick, Neal A. Schrimsher, Les C. Vinney, Mark S. Walchirk. (MMP)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil 3rd, 4th Securities & Antitrust list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2818 (PJS/HB). (MMP)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E Czuchry on behalf of Sally Pemberton. (Czuchry, Mark)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6406232) filed by Sally Pemberton. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Czuchry, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pemberton v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D. Buck
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarena S. Lin
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Rogan
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott P. Anderson
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann B. Gugino
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S Walchirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody H. Feragen
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal A. Schrimsher
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Misiak
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex N. Blanco
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W Wiltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Guggenheim
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen A Rudnick
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les C. Vinney
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Walchirk
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Wiltz
Represented By: Aaron G Thomas
Represented By: Patrick S Williams
Represented By: Jordan Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Pemberton
Represented By: Mark E Czuchry
Represented By: Timothy W Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?