M.S. v. H.T. et al
Plaintiff: M.S.
Defendant: Regions Hospital and H.T.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02837
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 (Text-only) AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: The Pretrial Conference is now set for 1/11/2019 at 1:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. *Time change only. (HAM)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (HAM)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Regions Hospital's parent company is HPI-Ramsey. No publicly held corporation owns more than 10% of Regions Hospital. (Novak, Anthony) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (lmb).
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by H.T., Regions Hospital. (Novak, Anthony)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Novak on behalf of H.T., Regions Hospital. (Novak, Anthony)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against H.T., Regions Hospital. filed by M.S.. No summons requested. (Rondoni, Francis)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to H.T., Regions Hospital. (KNK)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 18-2837 (MJD/TNL). (KNK)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial against H.T., Regions Hospital (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6409696) filed by M.S.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rondoni, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. v. H.T. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Francis J Rondoni
Represented By: Elizabeth C Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regions Hospital
Represented By: Wendy M Bratten
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.T.
Represented By: Wendy M Bratten
Represented By: Anthony J Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?