Hamilton v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Hamilton
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv02933
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
2 Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON CASE CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL, AND CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/21/2018. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-01549-NEB-LIB, 0:18-cv-02933-NEB-LIB(kt)
November 7, 2018 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Nicholas A. Migliaccio and Jason S. Rathod as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
November 7, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #13 Stipulation. (Hedlund, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Matthew D. Schelkopf re #13 Stipulation by Christopher Hamilton . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4)(Hedlund, Daniel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Case Consolidation, Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, and Case Schedule by Christopher Hamilton. Jointly Signed by American Honda Motor Co., Inc.. (Hedlund, Daniel)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac W Messmore on behalf of American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (Messmore, Isaac)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18cv2933 NEB/LIB. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/16/2018 and Judge David S. Doty on 10/17/18. (AKL)
October 15, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Eric Scott Fredrickson, Matthew Scott Harman, P. Michael Freed as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)cc: Eric Scott Fredrickson, Matthew Scott Harman, P. Michael Freed.(kt)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:18-cv-04367. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty and referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per 3rd/4th Master List.
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION to the District of Minnesota pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Defendant's responsive pleading deadline is deferred pending entry of a scheduling order by the District of Minnesota. The Clerk of Court is further ORDERED to CLOSE this case in the Court's records. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/15/18. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.'s Answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/15/18. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Civil Case Terminated. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Case electronically transferred to District of Minnesota. Copy of docket sheet included. (jkl) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Transferring Action to the District of Minnesota Purusant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Freed, P.) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jkl). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to #1 Complaint, by American Honda Motor Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freed, P.) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jkl). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Christopher Hamilton. American Honda Motor Company, Inc. served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Harman, Matthew) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons. OK, per TWT. (ss) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Honda Motor Company, Inc.. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Christopher Hamilton. (Harman, Matthew) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Hamilton. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8151414) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 10/15/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hamilton
Represented By: Daniel C Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company, Inc.
Represented By: Isaac W Messmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?