Clean Water and Air, LLC v. Prairie Island Indian Community
Plaintiff: Clean Water and Air, LLC
Defendant: Prairie Island Indian Community
Case Number: 0:2018cv02941
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Attorneys: The Motion for Stay (ECF No. 3) is GRANTED and all deadlines in this lawsuit are STAYED, pending receipt of comments, if any, from the United States Department of Justice and the United States Environmental Protection Agency and review of the [Proposed] Consent Judgment by the Court. If the Court declines to enter the [Proposed] Consent Judgment for any reason, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within forty-five (45) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/23/2018. (JMK)
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Prairie Island Indian Community. (KNK)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-2941 (MJD/HB). (KNK)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Clean Water and Air, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Michenfelder, Patrick)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion for Stay Pending Agency Review of Consent Judgment #3 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. (Duncan, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR STAY filed by Prairie Island Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Proposed Consent Judgment with Exhibit A)(Duncan, Richard) Modified on 10/24/2018 (kt).
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A Duncan on behalf of Prairie Island Indian Community. (Duncan, Richard)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Prairie Island Indian Community (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6436831) filed by Clean Water and Air, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Michenfelder, Patrick) Modified text on 10/19/2018 (kt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clean Water and Air, LLC v. Prairie Island Indian Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean Water and Air, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prairie Island Indian Community
Represented By: Richard A Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?