Romero Munoz v. Fouad et al
Plaintiff: Jaime Romero Munoz
Defendant: M D Construction, Mesud Didovic, Mervat Fouad, MRANS on Seventh, LLC and M & D Management Company
Case Number: 0:2018cv02973
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
2 Judge: Katherine M Menendez
3 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Mesud Didovic, Mervat Fouad, M & D Management Company, MRANS on Seventh, LLC re #9 Answer to Complaint on M D Construction (Richardson, Jessica)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Mesud Didovic, Mervat Fouad, M & D Management Company, MRANS on Seventh, LLC. (Richardson, Jessica)
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Mesud Didovic, Mervat Fouad, M & D Management Company, M D Construction, MRANS on Seventh, LLC. (AKL)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jaime Romero Munoz RE: Summons in 18-CV-2973. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. See order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 10/31/2018. (JMK) cc: Counsel with USM Forms. Modified text on 11/2/2018 (MMP).
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer for all further proceedings. Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-2973 (PJS/HB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 10/22/2018. (MMP)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18cv2973 JNE/KMM. (AKL)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 First Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jaime Romero Munoz. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jaime Romero Munoz. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ali, Jeffer) Modified on 10/19/2018 (AKL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero Munoz v. Fouad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M D Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesud Didovic
Represented By: Jessica C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mervat Fouad
Represented By: Jessica C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRANS on Seventh, LLC
Represented By: Jessica C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & D Management Company
Represented By: Jessica C. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Romero Munoz
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?