Ljubisavljevic v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Milosava Ljubisavljevic
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03006
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2609
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (JMK)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bank of America Corporation owns more than 10% of Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Schroeder, Mark) Modified on 11/16/2018 (KNK).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #6 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/14/2018. (ALM)
November 12, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Schroeder, Mark)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond by Bank of America, N.A.. Jointly Signed by Milosava Ljubisavljevic. (Schroeder, Mark)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milosava Ljubisavljevic. Bank of America, N.A. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Wilcox, Christopher)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. (lmb)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18-cv-3006 (JRT/HB). (lmb)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. (filing fee $400, receipt number MNDC-6455971) filed by Milosava Ljubisavljevic. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Wilcox, Christopher) Modified text on 10/25/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ljubisavljevic v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Mark G Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milosava Ljubisavljevic
Represented By: Christopher Wilcox
Represented By: Daniel M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?