Colquitt et al v. Dominium Management Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Ariel Colquitt and Lavunte Colquitt
Defendant: Dominium Management Services, LLC
Case Number: 0:2018cv03038
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 27 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt . (Ali, Jeffer)
November 28, 2018 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2018 re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Lavunte Colquitt, Ariel Colquitt. The MOTION for Temporary Restraining was moved, argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Erin Drost) (KMW)
November 21, 2018 Filing 25 Second DECLARATION of Jeffer Ali re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Ali, Jeffer)
November 21, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ali, Jeffer)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Susan J. Meyer in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Dominium Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kalla, Christopher)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Donna Hanbery in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Dominium Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Kalla, Christopher)
November 19, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Dominium Management Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Kalla, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on #19 Stipulation regarding the Motion Briefing and Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 . Opposition due by 11/19/2018. Reply due by 11/21/2018. The Motion Hearing is rescheduled for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/6/2018. (KMW)
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 STIPULATION by Dominium Management Services, LLC. (Kalla, Christopher)
November 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Kalla on behalf of All Defendants. (Kalla, Christopher)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed for Summons, Complaint and TRO Documents served on Dominium Management Services, LLC on 10/31/2018, filed by Ariel Colquitt. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Dominium Management Services, LLC. (MMP)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #2 #3 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 10/30/2018. (KMW)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 Redacted Document for #7 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Ariel Colquitt filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt.(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd, 4th, Civil Rights Housing/Acc. ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18-cv-3038 (NEB/DTS). (MMP)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration of Diana Snyder, LICSW in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt.(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 10 Declaration of Samuel Manning in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt.(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration of Jeffer Ali in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) J. Ali Decl. Ex. A, #2 Exhibit(s) J. Ali Decl. Ex. B, #3 Exhibit(s) J. Ali Decl. Ex. C, #4 Exhibit(s) J. Ali Decl. Ex. D)(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 Declaration of Lavunte Colquitt in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt.(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 Declaration of Ariel Colquitt in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A. Colquitt Decl. Ex. A, #2 Exhibit(s) A. Colquitt Decl. Ex. B, #3 Exhibit(s) A. Colquitt Decl. Ex. C, #4 Exhibit(s) A. Colquitt Decl. Ex. D, #5 FILED IN ERROR: RESTRICTED DUE TO PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS Exhibit(s) A. Colquitt Decl. Ex. E)(Ali, Jeffer) Modified on 10/29/2018 (kt).
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt.(Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Lavunte Colquitt. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Ariel Colquitt. (Ali, Jeffer)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dominium Management Services, LLC filed by Ariel Colquitt, Lavunte Colquitt. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ali, Jeffer) Modified text on 10/29/2018 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colquitt et al v. Dominium Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Colquitt
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavunte Colquitt
Represented By: Jeffer Ali, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominium Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Donna E Hanbery
Represented By: Christopher T Kalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?