Doe v. Cook County School District, IDS #166 et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Megan Myers, William Crandall, Mitch Dorr and Cook County School District, IDS #166
Case Number: 0:2018cv03051
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/14/2018. (KMW)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #2 Motion. All future pleadings in the present case shall refer to Plaintiff as John Doe; all future pleadings in the present case shall refer to any alleged victim in the incidents underlying the present case by a unique Jane Doe # __ pseudonym; all future pleadings in the present case shall refer to the parent of any student pseudonymously as described in the Order above; and all future pleadings in the present case shall refer to any non-party, non-victim students involved in the investigation underlying the present case by first and last initial pseudonyms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/9/2018. (VLM)
November 9, 2018 Filing 27 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #26 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Earley, Jennifer)
November 9, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Cook County School District, IDS #166, William Crandall, Mitch Dorr, Megan Myers. Jointly Signed by John Doe. (Earley, Jennifer)
November 8, 2018 Filing 25 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cook County School District, IDS #166, William Crandall, Mitch Dorr, Megan Myers . (Earley, Jennifer)
November 8, 2018 Filing 24 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Doe . (McGraw, Beau)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #22 Letter to District Judge. The parties request to extend the briefing schedule for the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #4 by one day is GRANTED. Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due Friday, November 9, 2018. Ordered by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/7/2018. (KMW)
November 7, 2018 Filing 22 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cook County School District, IDS #166, William Crandall, Mitch Dorr, Megan Myers . (Earley, Jennifer)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT - due by noon on 11/8/2018. Defendants shall file and serve their response to Plaintiffs Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Using a Pseudonym, [Docket No. 2], by no later than 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 8, 2018; and the undersigned will immediately take Plaintiffs Motion to Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Using a Pseudonym, [Docket No. 2], under advisement upon the parties written submissions as of 12:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 8, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 11/5/2018. (VLM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Mitch Dorr served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (McGraw, Beau)
November 5, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Megan Myers served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (McGraw, Beau)
November 5, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. William Crandall served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (McGraw, Beau)
November 5, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Cook County School District, IDS #166 served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (McGraw, Beau)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Letter filed by Defendants #15 . To allow Defendants a fair opportunity to respond, the Court will keep the briefing deadlines and hearing date as previously scheduled #14 . Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/2/2018. (KMW)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Cook County School District, IDS #166, William Crandall, Mitch Dorr, Megan Myers . (Earley, Jennifer)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested :The Motion Hearing is scheduled for 11/14/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. Opposition to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due 11/8/18 and the Reply is due 11/12/18. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 11/1/2018. (KMW)
November 1, 2018 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nancy E. Brasel: Telephone Conference held on 11/1/2018. A briefing and hearing schedule order shall be issued regarding the Motion for Preliminary Injunction today. (Court Reporter Tim Willette) (KMW)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 (Text-Only) NOTICE to Attorneys. Telephone Status Conference is set for 11/1/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. Chambers will call the parties. (KMW)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer K Earley on behalf of All Defendants. (Earley, Jennifer)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Cook County School District, IDS #166, William Crandall, Mitch Dorr, Megan Myers. (KNK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 5th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-3051 (NEB/LIB). (KNK)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe.(McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 Declaration of John Doe in Support of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe.(McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) P-1, #2 Exhibit(s) P-2, #3 Exhibit(s) P-3, #4 Exhibit(s) P-4, #5 Exhibit(s) P-5, #6 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by John Doe. (McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION To Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Using a Pseudonym re #1 Complaint, filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION To Allow Plaintiff to Proceed Using a Pseudonym re #1 Complaint, filed by John Doe. (McGraw, Beau)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6467433) filed by John Doe. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (McGraw, Beau)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Cook County School District, IDS #166 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Myers
Represented By: Jennifer K Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Crandall
Represented By: Jennifer K Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Dorr
Represented By: Jennifer K Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook County School District, IDS #166
Represented By: Jennifer K Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Beau D McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?