Boitnott v. TCF Banking & Savings, F.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Defendant: TCF Banking & Savings, F.A. and TCF National Bank
Case Number: 0:2018cv03062
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JLB)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/21/2018. (DLO)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge David S. Doty: Appearances: Patrick Michenfelder for plaintiff; Joseph Windler & Chelsea Ahmann for defendants; Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2018 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank - argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. TIME IN COURT: 33 minutes. (Court Reporter Renee Rogge) (CLB)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Windler, Joseph)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jerald Boitnott. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Michenfelder, Patrick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank.(Windler, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 Declaration of Julee Quarve-Peterson in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-C)(Windler, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration of David Nelson in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D)(Windler, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Windler, Joseph)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by TCF Banking & Savings, F.A., TCF National Bank. (Windler, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Windler, Joseph) Modified on 11/5/2018 (AKL).
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 11/2/2018. (CLB)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Chad A. Throndset as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (lmb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accomomdations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18-cv-3062 (DSD/KMM). (lmb)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. TCF National Bank is a wholly owned subsidiary of TCF Financial Corporation. (Windler, Joseph) Modified on 11/1/2018 (AKL).
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County District Court, case number unknown (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6468405) filed by TCF National Bank, TCF Banking & Savings, F.A. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Windler, Joseph) Modified text on 10/31/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boitnott v. TCF Banking & Savings, F.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF Banking & Savings, F.A.
Represented By: Chelsea Ahmann
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCF National Bank
Represented By: Chelsea Ahmann
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Boitnott
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?