Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc. v. Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.
Defendant: Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03186
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
2 Judge: David T Schultz
3 Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 19 Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and COUNTERCLAIM against Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc., filed by Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc. (Padmanabhan, Devan) Modified text on 1/2/2019 (lmb).
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER #11 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. The hearing on the motion #12 is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 12/20/2018. (RMM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.. filed by Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (composite), #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E) (Warzecha, Mark)
December 7, 2018 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss Complaint #11 Motion to Dismiss/General. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc..(Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3B (STP) before Judge Eric C. Tostrud. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Padmanabhan, Devan)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud and Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz for all further proceedings. Judge Joan N. Ericksen, Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-3186 ECT/DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 11/21/2018 and by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 11/26/18. (kt)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark F. Warzecha for Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc..; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelly G. Swartz for Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 11/19/2018. (JGK)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.. Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc. served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Pierce, Jack)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelly G. Swartz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6499825 filed by Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.. (Pierce, Jack)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark F. Warzecha. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6499791 filed by Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.. (Pierce, Jack)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mark F. Warzecha and Kelly G. Swartz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc. (MMP)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd, 4th, Patent list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-3186 (JNE/SER). (MMP)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack E. Pierce on behalf of Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.. (Pierce, Jack)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6496694) filed by Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '383 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Composite, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pierce, Jack) Modified text on 11/15/2018 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc. v. Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Erin O. Dungan
Represented By: Devan V Padmanabhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Rhino Leak Detection, Inc.
Represented By: Jack E. Pierce
Represented By: Kelly G. Swartz
Represented By: Mark F. Warzecha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?