Babich v. Ashpole et al
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Mattew G Whitaker, Thomas Blank, Peter Berg, Reed Ashpole, Matthew G. Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Petitioner: Stanislav V BABICH and Stanislav Valeryevich Babich
Consolidated Plaintiff: Esq, Rachel Engebretson
Case Number: 0:2018cv03302
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(AKL)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER on #8 Stipulation to Release the Petitioner from Custody. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 1/4/2019. (DLO)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #8 Stipulation. (Voss, Ana)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION by Reed Ashpole, Stanislav Valeryevich Babich, Peter Berg, Thomas Blank, Kirstjen Nielsen, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Voss, Ana)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO ANSWER. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/12/2018. (MME)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO ANSWER: Response to the Petition due within 30 days of this order. Reply to answer due within 30 days of when this answer is filed. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 12/7/2018. (MME)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Fuller on behalf of Peter Berg, Thomas Blank, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald D. Vitiello, Matthew G. Whitaker. (Fuller, David)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 12/4/2018. (CLB)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Engebretson, Rachel) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (lmb).
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-3302 (DSD/SER). (lmb)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $ 5, receipt number AMNDC-6525883) filed by Stanislav V BABICH. Filer requests summons issued. (Engebretson, Rachel) Modified text on 12/3/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Babich v. Ashpole et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattew G Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Blank
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Ashpole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: David W Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Esq, Rachel Engebretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanislav V BABICH
Represented By: Rachel M Engebretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanislav Valeryevich Babich
Represented By: Rachel M Engebretson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?