Itasca Images, LLC v. Horizon Supply Company

Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Defendant: Horizon Supply Company
Case Number: 0:2018cv03387
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TRANFERRING CASE based on #20 the Stipulation filed by the parties. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 2/7/2019. (KMW)
February 7, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #20 Stipulation,. (Flaherty, Scott)
February 7, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue to Western District of Pennsylvania by Itasca Images, LLC. Jointly Signed by Horizon Supply Company. (Flaherty, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #14 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue: Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Burke, Michael) Modified text/location on 1/17/2019 (lmb).
January 17, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Jim Roe in SUPPORT OF #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Burke on behalf of Horizon Supply Company. (Burke, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Itasca Images, LLC re #1 Complaint,, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet (Flaherty, Scott)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Horizon Supply Company answer due 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 1/4/2019. (MME)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Horizon Supply Company.(Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Eric J. Steinhoff in Support of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed : Date and time to be determined. (Steinhoff, Eric)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed filed by Horizon Supply Company. (Steinhoff, Eric)
December 14, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Horizon Supply Company. (lmb)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 18-cv-3387 (NEB/SER). (lmb)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Itasca Images, LLC. (Flaherty, Scott)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Horizon Supply Company (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6547738) filed by Itasca Images, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S, #20 Exhibit(s) T, #21 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flaherty, Scott) Modified text on 12/14/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itasca Images, LLC v. Horizon Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Supply Company
Represented By: Michael Thomas Burke
Represented By: Eric J Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Represented By: Scott M Flaherty
Represented By: O. Joseph Balthazor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?