Edwards v. McLeod County Jail
Plaintiff: John Edwards
Defendant: McLeod County Jail
Case Number: 0:2018cv03391
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Prisoner Complaint, filed by John Edwards. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 2/4/2019. (HAM) cc:John Edwards. Modified text on 2/5/2019 (MMG).
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail not re-sent to John Edwards. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/18/2019 (KMH).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by John Edwards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 1/4/2019. c:John Edwards. (HAM) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (MMG).
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by John Edwards. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 12/18/2018 (KMH).
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against McLeod County Jail filed by John Edwards. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd by KMH on 12/18/2018 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. McLeod County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLeod County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?