Doe v. North Homes, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe (a pseudonym) and Jane Doe
Defendant: Devin Michael Wood, John Does 1 - 5, North Homes, Inc., individually and d/b/a North Homes Children and Family Services and I.T.A.S.K.I.N. Juvenile Center, John Does 6 - 10, Connie Ross and North Homes, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03419
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A Solheim on behalf of North Homes, Inc., Connie Ross. (Solheim, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #9 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by North Homes, Inc., Connie Ross.(Bodden, Kenya)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (Bodden, Kenya)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss/General Plaintiff's Complaint filed by North Homes, Inc., Connie Ross. (Bodden, Kenya)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. (Storms, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. (Storms, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. Connie Ross waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Storms, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (kt).
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: WILL REFILE. WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jane Doe. North Homes, Inc. waiver sent on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Storms, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/16/2019 (kt).
December 19, 2018 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RE)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to John Does 1 - 5, John Does 6 - 10, North Homes, Inc., Connie Ross, Devin Michael Wood. (MMG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 5th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-3419 WMW/LIB. (MMG)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Amended Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (Storms, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6556204) filed by Jane Doe (a pseudonym). Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Storms, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. North Homes, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Michael Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Homes, Inc., individually and d/b/a North Homes Children and Family Services and I.T.A.S.K.I.N. Juvenile Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 6 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Ross
Represented By: Kenya C Bodden
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Kenya C Bodden
Represented By: Mark A Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe (a pseudonym)
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey M Montpetit
Represented By: Jeffrey S Storms
Represented By: Paul Convery Dworak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?