Najajrah v. Brott et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Jamal Najajrah
Defendant: Joel Brott, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker, Peter Berg and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 0:2018cv03423
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mohammad Jamal Najajrah. (Martin, Vincent)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 1/8/2019. (VLM)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Peter Berg, Joel Brott, Kirstjen Nielsen, Ronald Vitiello, Matthew Whitaker. (lmb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 18-cv-3423 (PJS/LIB). (lmb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $ 5, receipt number AMNDC-6556937) filed by Mohammad Jamal Najajrah. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Exhibit(s) D, #7 Exhibit(s) E, #8 Exhibit(s) F). (Martin, Vincent) Modified text on 12/18/2018 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Najajrah v. Brott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Brott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vitiello
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Berg
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Jamal Najajrah
Represented By: Vincent P Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?