In Re Municipal Stormwater Pond Coordinated Litigation
Plaintiff: City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Minnetonka, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota and City of St. Cloud, Minnesota
Defendant: Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Koppers Inc., Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Bonsal American, Inc., Vance Brothers, Inc., Brewer Company, The, Beazer East, Inc., Stella-Jones Inc. and Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2018cv03495
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
2 Judge: Joan N Ericksen
3 Judge: Katherine M Menendez
4 Judge: David T Schultz
5 Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 177 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #176 Motion Hearing,, to Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck. (Bachman, Lisa)
September 20, 2019 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan N. Ericksen: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2019. This motion hearing also applies to the other nine related cases: 18cv3496 (JNE/KMM); 18cv3497 (JNE/KMM); 18cv3498 (JNE/KMM); 18cv3501 (JNE/KMM); 18cv3503 (JNE/KMM); 18cv3509 (JNE/KMM); 19cv58 (JNE/KMM); 19cv119 (JNE/KMM); and 19cv916 (JNE/KMM). Motions argued and taken under advisement. Each side may submit a short summary of any arguments they were unable to cover at the hearing by end of the business day on September 26, 2019. The parties are reminded to keep remarks brief and avoid repeating any arguments covered at the hearing. (Court Reporter Maria Weinbeck) (CBC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 175 EXHIBIT List re #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Brewer Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Illustratives for Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, 9(b), and 12(b)(6))(McCollum, Robert)
August 30, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel (Shulman, Daniel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 173 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Shulman re #172 Order/Notice to Attorney by City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of St. Cloud, Minnesota, City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota . (Shulman, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER re jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 8/13/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03495-JNE-KMM, 0:19-cv-01891-JNE-KMM(CBC)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 CORRECTED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/31/2019. (KAT)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/31/2019. (KAT)
July 26, 2019 Filing 169 REPLY re #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Aberson, D)
July 26, 2019 Filing 168 RESPONSE in Support re #122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Certificate of Compliance)(Anstoetter, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 167 Reply to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (CORRECTED) filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Davis, Andrew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 166 Reply to Response to Motion re #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Aberson, D)
July 26, 2019 Filing 165 Reply to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Davis, Andrew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 164 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re #163 Reply to Response to Motion of Michael Mancione. (Nierengarten, Julia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 163 Reply to Response to Motion re #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nierengarten, Julia)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #161 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erik Hansell for Vance Brothers, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/24/2019. (NAH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 161 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erik L. Hansell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7014492 filed by Vance Brothers, Inc.. (Pattee, Randall)
July 22, 2019 Filing 159 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Erik L. Hansell as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER of Reassignment of Related Cases that 19-cv-1891 DWF/BRT has been reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/19/2019. (CLK)
July 19, 2019 Filing 158 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Beazer East, Inc., Koppers Inc.. Jointly Signed by Koppers Inc., Beazer East, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holding LLC and Rain Carbon Inc., Stella-Jones Corp. and Stella-Jones Inc., Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Bonsal American, Inc., The Brewer Company, Specialty Technology & Research, Inc., and Vance Brothers, Inc..(Aberson, D)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #156 Letter to Magistrate Judge seeking a one-week extension of the deadline by which the parties are to file their 26(f) Report. The Request is GRANTED. The 26(f) Report is due on or before 7/19/19. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 7/15/2019. (KAT)
July 12, 2019 Filing 156 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Koppers Inc. re Extension of Deadline to File Rule 26(f) Report. (McCarthy, Michael)
July 11, 2019 Filing 155 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Graff, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 154 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Anstoetter, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 153 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Davis, Andrew)
July 8, 2019 Filing 152 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Jacobson, Mark)
July 8, 2019 Filing 151 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Aberson, D)
June 28, 2019 Filing 150 EXHIBIT List and Exhibits 1 - 9 Filed in Support re #149 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of St. Cloud, Minnesota, City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Declaration of Ellen Hiniker, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - Declaration of Edan Rotenberg, #3 Exhibit(s) 3 - Declaration of Matt Saam, #4 Exhibit(s) 4 - Declaration of Bryan Gruidl, #5 Exhibit(s) 5 - Declaration of Ryan Peterson, #6 Exhibit(s) 6 - Declaration of Russ Matthys, #7 Exhibit(s) 7 - Declaration of Robert Ellis, #8 Exhibit(s) 8 - Declaration of Jeff Oliver, #9 Exhibit(s) 9- Declaration of Will Manchester)(Shulman, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of St. Cloud, Minnesota, City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Shulman, Daniel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of St. Cloud, Minnesota, City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Shulman, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #146 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Diana Gjonaj for City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of St. Cloud, Minnesota, and for City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/25/2019. (NAH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 146 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Diana Gjonaj. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6956023 filed by City of Apple Valley, City of Bloomington, Minnesota, City of Burnsville, Minnesota, City of Eagan, Minnesota, City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota, City of Golden Valley, City of Maple Grove, City of Minnetonka, City of St. Cloud, Minnesota, City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota. (Evans, Janet)
June 24, 2019 Filing 145 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. HBMA Holdings LLC (HBMAH), a Delaware limited liability company, owns 100% of the capital stock of Beazer. Both Beazer and HBMAH are indirect, wholly-owned subsidiaries of HeidelbergCement AG, a German corporation whose stock is traded on various German stock exchanges. (Aberson, D) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (KDS).
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting in part (57) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:18-cv-03495-JNE-KMM(Written Opinion) Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 6/14/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03495-JNE-KMM et al.(BJP)
June 10, 2019 Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 05-28-19 before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (52 pages). Transcriber: Erin Drost. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 7/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019. (EDD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (EDD)
June 6, 2019 Filing 141 REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of a Digital Audio Recording. (Aberson, D)
May 28, 2019 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2019 re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. See minute entry for additional details. (BJP)
May 24, 2019 Filing 139 NOTICE of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate by Bonsal American, Inc. re #73 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Bachman, Lisa) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (JLB).
May 24, 2019 Filing 138 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Brewer Company, The. (McCollum, Robert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE by Vance Brothers, Inc. re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Pattee, Randall)
May 23, 2019 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Revell on behalf of Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Revell, Micah)
May 22, 2019 Filing 135 NOTICE by Brewer Company, The re #73 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (McCollum, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Filing 134 NOTICE by Beazer East, Inc. re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Aberson, D)
May 22, 2019 Filing 133 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Bonsal American, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Oldcastle Building Products, Inc.. (Bachman, Lisa) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (KNK).
May 17, 2019 Filing 132 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #122 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stella-Jones Corp..(Anstoetter, Mark)
May 17, 2019 Filing 131 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Anstoetter, Mark)
May 17, 2019 Filing 130 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stella-Jones Corp..(Anstoetter, Mark)
May 17, 2019 Filing 129 MEMORANDUM in Support re #122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Exhibit(s) A)(Anstoetter, Mark)
May 17, 2019 Filing 128 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beazer East, Inc..(McCarthy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 127 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #123 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beazer East, Inc..(McCarthy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 126 Declaration of Mary D. Wright in Support of #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beazer East, Inc..(McCarthy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 125 MEMORANDUM in Support re #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(McCarthy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (McCarthy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 123 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beazer East, Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
May 17, 2019 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Anstoetter, Mark)
May 17, 2019 Filing 121 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Graff, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall J Pattee on behalf of Vance Brothers, Inc.. (Pattee, Randall)
May 17, 2019 Filing 119 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beazer East, Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Brewer Company, The, Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Vance Brothers, Inc..(Carroll, Christina)
May 17, 2019 Filing 118 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #115 Motion to Dismiss/General, filed by Beazer East, Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Brewer Company, The, Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Vance Brothers, Inc..(Carroll, Christina)
May 17, 2019 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM in Support re #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beazer East, Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Brewer Company, The, Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Vance Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carroll, Christina)
May 17, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Carroll, Christina)
May 17, 2019 Filing 115 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Beazer East, Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Brewer Company, The, Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Vance Brothers, Inc.. (Carroll, Christina)
May 17, 2019 Filing 114 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation.(Davis, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 113 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #109 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation.(Davis, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 112 Declaration of Al Morris in Support of #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation.(Davis, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in Support re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Davis, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Davis, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Davis, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 108 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC.(Graff, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 107 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #103 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC.(Graff, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 106 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Mancione in SUPPORT OF #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC.(Graff, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Support re #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Graff, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Graff, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 103 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Graff, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 102 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE. NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Davis on behalf of Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Davis, Andrew) Modified text on 5/20/2019 (JLB).
May 16, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J.M. Pelikan on behalf of Stella-Jones Corp.. (Pelikan, Matthew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Burnsville, Minnesota (Shulman, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Burnsville, Minnesota (Shulman, Daniel)
May 14, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Schleicher on behalf of Beazer East, Inc.. (Schleicher, Steven)
May 14, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J.M. Pelikan on behalf of Stella-Jones Corp.. (Pelikan, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by D Scott Aberson on behalf of Beazer East, Inc.. (Aberson, D)
May 14, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C McCarthy on behalf of Beazer East, Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
May 14, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia J Nierengarten on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Nierengarten, Julia)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting Joint Stipulation #91 Regarding Motion to Dismiss Briefing. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 5/13/2019. (CBC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 92 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #91 Stipulation,. (McCarthy, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 91 STIPULATION re Motion to Dismiss Briefing by Koppers Inc.. Jointly Signed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Stella-Jones Corporation, Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Bonsal American, Inc., Specialty Technology & Research, Inc., and The Brewer Company. (McCarthy, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lamm Bachman on behalf of Bonsal American, Inc.. (Bachman, Lisa)
April 22, 2019 Filing 89 Reply to Response to Motion re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Shulman, Daniel)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to E-mail re: (56 in 0:18-cv-03509-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (57 in 0:18-cv-03501-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (56 in 0:19-cv-00058-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (56 in 0:19-cv-00119-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (57 in 0:18-cv-03495-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (57 in 0:18-cv-03498-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (58 in 0:18-cv-03503-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (58 in 0:18-cv-03496-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases, (58 in 0:18-cv-03497-JNE-KMM) Motion to Consolidate Cases. The plaintiffs have written to the Court to inquire whether the pending Motion to Consolidate is considered a dispositive motion, in which case it is governed by D. Minn. LR 7.1(c), and a reply brief is permitted, or a nodispositive motion, where no reply brief is automatically allowed pursuant to D. Minn. LR 7.1(b). The Court finds that the pending motion seeks nondispositive relief. Nonetheless, the Court will grant the plaintiffs' request to file a reply brief in this matter on or before 4/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/19/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03496-JNE-KMM et al.(BJP)
April 19, 2019 Filing 87 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.. (Rowley, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L McCollum on behalf of Brewer Company, The. (McCollum, Robert)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE:Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Cases set for 5/28/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 4/15/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03495-JNE-KMM et al.(KAT)
April 11, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE by Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation re #73 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Joinder in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate (Davis, Andrew)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF REFERENCE: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), (B) and (C), Plaintiffs' Motions to Consolidate [Dkt. No. #56 ] in Case Nos. 18-3509, 19-58, 19-119; [Dkt. No. #57 ] in Case Nos. 18-3495, 18-3498, 18-3501; and [Dkt. No. #58 ] in Case Nos. 18-3496, 18-3497 and 18-3503 are referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/11/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03495-JNE-KMM et al.(CBC)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order of Reassignment of Related Cases. This case is reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. The new case number is 18-cv-3495 JNE/KMM. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/10/2019 (CLK) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (CLK).
April 10, 2019 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rowley, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 80 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Bonsal American, Inc. served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Beazer East, Inc. served on 3/15/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 78 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Vance Brothers, Inc. served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 77 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Brewer Company, The served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 76 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Specialty Technology and Research, Inc. served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Davis, Andrew)
April 8, 2019 Filing 74 EXHIBIT List re #73 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Stella-Jones Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Carroll, Christina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Proposing Alternative Relief filed by Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Stella-Jones Corp.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Carroll, Christina)
April 5, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Davis on behalf of Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation. (Davis, Andrew)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF DIRECTION TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASE That 19-cv-916 has been reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 4/2/2019 and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 4/4/19. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03495-NEB-BRT et al.(JLB)
April 4, 2019 Filing 70 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Ruetgers Canada Inc. waiver sent on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Rotenberg, Edan)
April 3, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney Zane Umsted (Umsted, Zane)
April 3, 2019 Filing 68 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Matthew G. Nelson, Chelsea L. Gauger as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (JLB)
April 2, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Rowley on behalf of Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.. (Rowley, Michael)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER on #62 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 3/22/2019. (MSK)
March 20, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Kari S Berman on behalf of Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Berman, Kari)
March 20, 2019 Filing 64 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 348 (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Shulman, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 63 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #62 Stipulation,. (McCarthy, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION to Extend Time by Koppers Inc.. Jointly Signed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota, Koppers Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., and Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (McCarthy, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota.(Shulman, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 60 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #57 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota.(Shulman, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Shulman, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases : Date and time to be determined. (Shulman, Daniel)
March 18, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. (Shulman, Daniel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/6/2019. (MSK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 55 Summons Issued as to Stella-Jones Corp., Stella-Jones Inc., Vance Brothers, Inc. (JLB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Beazer East, Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Brewer Company, The, Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc. (JLB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Stella-Jones Corp., Beazer East, Inc., Stella-Jones Inc., Bonsal American, Inc., Specialty Technology and Research, Inc., Vance Brothers, Inc., The Brewer Company. filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Filer requests summons issued. (Shulman, Daniel)
February 7, 2019 Filing 52 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Stella-Jones Corporations parent corporation is Stella-Jones U.S. Holding Corporation. Stella-Jones U.S. Holding Corporation is owned by Stella-Jones Inc., which is a Canadian Corporation and is publicly traded on the Toronto Stock Exchange Defendant Stella-Jones Corp. (Anstoetter, Mark) Modified text on 2/8/2019 (JLB).
February 7, 2019 Filing 51 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rain CII Carbon LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rain Commodities (USA) is a corporate parent of Defendant Rain Carbon Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 7, 2019 Filing 49 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Rain Carbon Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Rain Carbon Holdings LLC. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 6, 2019 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Status Conference held on 2/5/2019. (MSK) Modified text on 2/6/2019 (MSK).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER on #33 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/6/2019. (MSK)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brenton David Dwerlkotte for Stella-Jones Corp.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/6/2019. (NAH)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark Anstoetter for Stella-Jones Corp.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John K Sherk, III for Stella-Jones Corp.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christina M. Carroll for Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc. and for Ruetgers Canada Inc..; granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Tami Lyn Azorsky for Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc. and for Ruetgers Canada Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert L Shuftan for Koppers Inc.. Approved by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/5/2019. (JGK)
February 4, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tami Lyn Azorsky. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6647857 filed by Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christina M. Carroll. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6647774 filed by Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc.. (Jacobson, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert L. Shuftan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6647766 filed by Koppers Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
February 4, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M Robbins on behalf of Stella-Jones Corp.. (Robbins, Jennifer)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: Plaintiff and Defendants Koppers, Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., and Lone Star Specialty Products ("these Defendants") have filed a joint stipulation seeking to extend the deadline to amend the Complaint up to March 19, 2019, and that the deadline for these Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint would be extended up to May 24, 2019. The Court will consider these requests following a status call on February 5, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. Meanwhile, to avoid concern over the current answer deadline for these Defendants, the Court will extend the deadline for Defendants' answer or to otherwise respond until March 4, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/1/2019. Associated Cases: 0:18-cv-03501-NEB-BRT et al.(MSK)
February 1, 2019 Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Tami Lyn Azorsky; Christina M. Carroll; Robert L. Shuftan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 1/31/2019. (MSK)
January 31, 2019 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #33 Stipulation. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION by Koppers Inc.. Jointly Signed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota, Ruetgers Canada Inc., Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Koppers Inc., and Lone Star Specialty Products, LLP. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Stella-Jones Corp..(Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 31 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Stella-Jones Corp..(Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel M Muscoplat on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Muscoplat, Joel)
January 30, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Zane A. Umsted on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Umsted, Zane)
January 30, 2019 Filing 27 DISCLOSURES Rule 7.1 by Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC.(Graff, Robert)
January 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Graff on behalf of Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC. (Graff, Robert)
January 30, 2019 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Koppers Holdings Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Koppers Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven L Schleicher on behalf of Koppers Inc.. (Schleicher, Steven)
January 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by D Scott Aberson on behalf of Koppers Inc.. (Aberson, D)
January 30, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John K. Sherk. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6637837 filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C McCarthy on behalf of Koppers Inc.. (McCarthy, Michael)
January 30, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Brenton Dwerlkotte. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6637447 filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark D. Anstoetter. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6637321 filed by Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Madel on behalf of Stella-Jones Corp.. (Madel, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson for all further proceedings. Judge Michael J. Davis, Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv3495 (NEB/BRT). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 1/25/2019, Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/29/2019, Donovan W. Frank on 1/25/2019, Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/25/2019 and Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/25/2019. (KNK)
January 28, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT Amended Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment re #1 Complaint. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robin Lynn Greenwald for City of Burnsville, Minnesota.; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nancy Christensen for City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/22/2019. (JGK)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nancy Christensen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6616290 filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. (Evans, Janet)
January 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robin Greenwald. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6616279 filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. (Evans, Janet)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Stella-Jones Corp. served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Rain Carbon Inc. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Rain Carbon Holdings LLC served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Koppers Inc. served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Shulman, Daniel)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edan Rotenberg for City of Burnsville, Minnesota. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/11/2019. (NAH)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edan Rotenberg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6597918 filed by City of Burnsville, Minnesota. (Evans, Janet)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation, Koppers Inc., Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC, Rain Carbon Holdings LLC, Rain Carbon Inc., Ruetgers Canada Inc., Stella-Jones Corp.. (AKL)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Robin L. Greenwald; Nancy Christensen; Edan Rotenberg; Reed Super; Nicholas Tapert; Michael DiGiulio as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (AKL)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 18cv3495 MJD/DTS. (AKL)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6575006) filed by City of Burnsville. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shulman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Municipal Stormwater Pond Coordinated Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain Carbon Holdings LLC
Represented By: Mark A Jacobson
Represented By: Christina M. Carroll
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Represented By: Kari S Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rain Carbon Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Jacobson
Represented By: Christina M. Carroll
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Represented By: Kari S Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella-Jones Corp.
Represented By: Brenton David Dwerlkotte
Represented By: Mark Anstoetter
Represented By: Jennifer M Robbins
Represented By: John K Sherk, III
Represented By: Christopher W. Madel
Represented By: Matthew J.M. Pelikan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koppers Inc.
Represented By: Steven L Schleicher
Represented By: Robert L Shuftan
Represented By: Michael C McCarthy
Represented By: D Scott Aberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopers Creek Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Kevin P. Kitchen
Represented By: Micah Revell
Represented By: Kadee Jo Anderson
Represented By: Andrew W Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruetgers Canada Inc.
Represented By: Mark A Jacobson
Represented By: Christina M. Carroll
Represented By: Tami Lyn Azorsky
Represented By: Kari S Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Specialty Products, LLC
Represented By: Joel M Muscoplat
Represented By: Zane A. Umsted
Represented By: Robert L Graff
Represented By: Julia J Nierengarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonsal American, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Lamm Bachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vance Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Hansell
Represented By: Randall J Pattee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewer Company, The
Represented By: Daniel J Singel
Represented By: Cheryl A Hood Langel
Represented By: Robert L McCollum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Represented By: Steven L Schleicher
Represented By: Michael C McCarthy
Represented By: D Scott Aberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella-Jones Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Technology and Research, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Young
Represented By: Michael S Rowley
Represented By: Elizabeth L Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Burnsville, Minnesota
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Eagan, Minnesota
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Minnetonka
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Golden Valley
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Maple Grove
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Whitebear Lake, Minnesota
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Eden Prairie, Minnesota
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Apple Valley
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Bloomington, Minnesota
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of St. Cloud, Minnesota
Represented By: Nancy Quattlebaum Burke
Represented By: Janet C. Evans
Represented By: Daniel R. Shulman
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Robin Lynn Greenwald
Represented By: Nancy Christensen
Represented By: Diana Gjonaj
Represented By: David L Shulman
Represented By: Craig A. Buske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?