Favors v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Favors
Defendant: Dave Frey, Bruce Beaman and Nancy Johnson
Case Number: 0:2019cv00032
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
0 Judge: Tony N Leung
1 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER TO THE COURT from Joseph Anthony Favors. (JLB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JLB)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Joseph Anthony Favors re Filing Fee or App for IFP Due. (lmb) cc: Favors with App for IFP.
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joseph Anthony Favors.(lmb) Document QC'd on 1/23/2019 (NAH).
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. (lmb) Document QC'd on 1/23/2019 (NAH).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bruce Beaman, Dave Frey, Nancy Johnson, filed by Joseph Anthony Favors. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Part 2 of 2), #2 Table of Contents, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Envelope) (lmb) cc: Plaintiff. Document QC'd on 1/23/2019 (NAH). Modified event text on 2/6/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Favors v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Beaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Anthony Favors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?