Mikulak v. Dakota County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Juanel Anthony Mikulak
Defendant: Office of the Dakota County Sheriff, Tim Leslie and Dakota County Jail
Case Number: 0:2019cv00035
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: David S Doty
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT. cc: Juanel Anthony Mikulak with Appeal Packet (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(JLB)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re #10 Report and Recommendation; denying #13 Motion for Certificate of Appealability(Written Opinion) Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 2/27/2019. (DLO) cc: Juanel Anthony Mikulak. Modified text on 2/27/2019 (JLB).
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dakota County Jail, Tim Leslie, Office of the Dakota County Sheriff re #14 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation (Pipenhagen, Heather)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #12 Report and Recommendation . (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Pipenhagen, Heather)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #11 Exhibit: Scanned Envelope (KMH)
February 19, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT filed by Petitioner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (lmb)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juanel Mikulak. (AKL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2019: #1 Scanned Envelope) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 2/20/19 (KMH).
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 2/5/2019. (VLM) cc: Juanel Anthony Mikulak. Modified text on 2/5/2019 (JLB).
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT D re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D Part 2, #2 Exhibit D Part 3, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope 1, #5 Envelope 2)(AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 2/5/19 (KMH).
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/28/2019 (KMH).
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/28/2019 (KMH).
January 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #4 Letter: Rescanned Envelope (KMH)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dakota County Jail, Tim Leslie, Office of the Dakota County Sheriff (Pipenhagen, Heather)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Dawn Pipenhagen on behalf of Dakota County Jail, Tim Leslie, Office of the Dakota County Sheriff. (Pipenhagen, Heather)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Plaintiff to the Court. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AKL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #2 Rescanned Envelope) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 1/24/2019 (KMH).
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dakota County Jail, Tim Leslie, Office of the Dakota County Sheriff Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. (AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/10/2019 (KMH).
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Juanel Anthony Mikulak. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (cc: Mikulak) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AKL) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/10/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mikulak v. Dakota County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Dakota County Sheriff
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Heather Dawn Pipenhagen
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Leslie
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Heather Dawn Pipenhagen
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota County Jail
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Heather Dawn Pipenhagen
Represented By: Edwin William Stockmeyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanel Anthony Mikulak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?