United States of America v. $49,831 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $49,831 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 0:2019cv00077
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of of PUBLICATION by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Baune, Craig)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Served on 1/24/19. (KNK) Document QC'd by KMH on 1/31/2019 (KMH).
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued. (kt)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $49,831 in U.S. Currency. filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Baune, Craig)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM issued conventionally. (AKL)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-77 (ECT/TNL). (KNK)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $49,831 in U.S. Currency filed by United States of America. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Baune, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $49,831 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $49,831 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Craig R Baune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?